EP2873329 - Process of whey protein separation from milk medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/21] | Process of whey protein separation from milk medium and apparatus for its implementation | ||
[2017/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Univerzita Palackého Krízkovského 8 771 47 Olomouc / CZ | [2017/20] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Univerzita Palackého Krízkovského 8 771 47 Olomouc / CZ | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Holá, Katerina Horní Hejcínská 51/6 779 00 Olomouc / CZ | 02 /
Zboril, Radek Jarmily Glazarové 354/9D 779 00 Olomouc / CZ | 03 /
Medrik, Ivo Drahanovice 125 783 44 Drahanovice / CZ | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Hartvichova, Katerina HARBER IP s.r.o. Dukelskych hrdinu 567/52 170 00 Praha 7 / CZ | [N/P] |
Former [2017/20] | Hartvichova, Katerina Inventia s.r.o. Na Belidle 3 150 00 Praha 5 / CZ | ||
Former [2015/21] | Soukup, Petr Videnska 8 772 00 Olomouc / CZ | Application number, filing date | 14003635.1 | 27.10.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | CZ20130000885 | 15.11.2013 Original published format: CZ 20130885 | [2015/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873329 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2873329 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A23C9/146, A23J1/20, C07K14/79, C07K1/18, C12N9/08 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
C07K14/79 (EP);
A23C9/1465 (EP);
A23J1/20 (EP);
A23J1/205 (EP);
C07K1/18 (EP);
C12N9/0065 (EP);
C12Y111/01007 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Molkeproteintrennung aus einem Milchmedium | [2017/14] | English: | Process of whey protein separation from milk medium | [2017/14] | French: | Procédé de séparation de protéines de lactosérum à partir d'un support de lait | [2017/14] |
Former [2015/21] | Verfahren zur Molkeproteintrennung aus einem Milchmedium und Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung | ||
Former [2015/21] | Process of whey protein separation from milk medium and apparatus for its implementation | ||
Former [2015/21] | Procédé de séparation de protéines de lactosérum à partir d'un support de lait et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre | Examination procedure | 25.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/21] | 18.11.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.10.2014 | AL | 17.05.2017 | AT | 17.05.2017 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | HR | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | MK | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | RS | 17.05.2017 | SM | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | NO | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | LU | 27.10.2017 | MT | 27.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 27.10.2014 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | HU | 27.10.2014 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 27.10.2014 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
MK | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 27.10.2014 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CY | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 27.10.2014 | |
AT | 17.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
MT | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 27.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
SM | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
RS | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 17.05.2017 | |
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
HR | 17.05.2017 | ||
NO | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [IDA]US4791193 (OKONOGI SHIGEO [JP], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 9, line 25 * * example - * [A] 10-14; | [XI]EP0352678 (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 35 * * example - * * figure - *[I] 1-9; | [XAI]US4976865 (SANCHEZ VICTOR [FR], et al) [X] 10 * column 1, line 1 - column 9, line 12 * * examples 1-2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-9 [I] 11-14; | [IDA]US5516675 (UCHIDA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 30 * * example - * [A] 10-14; | [IA]EP1087828 (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK]) [I] 10-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0066]; example - * * figure - * [A] 1-9; | [XAI]CN101032671 (FANG YAMIN [CN]) [X] 10,11 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-9 [I] 12-14; | [XI]EP2272378 (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0130] * * example - * * figure - * [I] 2,5,6,9-14; | [I] - GEOFFREY N. BROWN ET AL, "Multi-cycle recovery of lactoferrin and lactoperoxidase from crude whey using fimbriated high-capacity magnetic cation exchangers and a novel "rotor-stator" high-gradient magnetic separator", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20130622), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1002/bit.24842, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1714 - 1725, XP055174347 [I] 1-14 * page 1714, column 1, line 1 - page 1725, column 1, line 21 * * figure - * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24842 | by applicant | US4436658 | US4791193 | US5516675 | US5596082 | US5919913 | US6942806 | US2005220953 | US7932069 | CZ23725U | - LEVAY. P.F.; VILJOEN, M., HEMATOL. J., (1995), vol. 80, pages 252 - 267 | - GUTTERIDGE, J. M.; PATERSON, S. K.; SEGAL, A. W.; HALLIWELL, B., BIOCHEM. J., (1981), vol. 199, pages 259 - 261 | - TUCCARI, G.; BARRESI, G., BIOMETALS, (2011), vol. 24, pages 775 - 784 | - OSTDAL, H.; BJERRUM, M. J.; PEDERSEN, J. A; ANDERSEN, H. J., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2000), vol. 48, pages 3939 - 3944 | - SANCHEZ, L.; PEIRO, J. M.; CASTILLO, H.; PEREZ, M. D.; ENA, J. M.; CALVO, M. J., FOOD SCI., (1992), vol. 57, pages 873 - 879 | - C.J. FEE; A. CHAND, SEP. PURIF. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 48, pages 143 - 149 | - SAFARIK, I.; SAFARIKOVA, M., BIOMAGN. RES. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 17, pages 1 - 17 | - FRANZREB, M.; SIEMANN-HERZBERG, M.; HOBLEY, T. J.; THOMAS, O. R. T., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 70, pages 505 - 516 | - HEEBOLL-NIELSEN, A.; JUSTESEN, S. F. L.; HOBLEY, T. J.; THOMAS, O. R. T., SEP. SCI. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 39, pages 2891 - 2914 | - HEEBOLL-NIELSEN, A.; JUSTESEN, S. F. L.; THOMAS, O. R. T., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 113, pages 247 - 262 | - CHEN, L.; GUO, C.; GUAN, Y.; LIU, H., SEP. PURIF. TECHNOL., (2007), vol. 56, pages 168 - 174 |