Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2873329

EP2873329 - Process of whey protein separation from milk medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/21]Process of whey protein separation from milk medium and apparatus for its implementation
[2017/14]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.03.2018
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.04.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.03.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
[2017/20]
Former [2015/21]For all designated states
Univerzita Palackého
Krízkovského 8
771 47 Olomouc / CZ
Inventor(s)01 / Holá, Katerina
Horní Hejcínská 51/6
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
02 / Zboril, Radek
Jarmily Glazarové 354/9D
779 00 Olomouc / CZ
03 / Medrik, Ivo
Drahanovice 125
783 44 Drahanovice / CZ
 [2015/21]
Representative(s)Hartvichova, Katerina
Inventia s.r.o.
Na Belidle 3
150 00 Praha 5 / CZ
[2017/20]
Former [2015/21]Soukup, Petr
Videnska 8
772 00 Olomouc / CZ
Application number, filing date14003635.127.10.2014
[2015/21]
Priority number, dateCZ2013000088515.11.2013         Original published format: CZ 20130885
[2015/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2873329
Date:20.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2873329
Date:17.05.2017
Language:EN
[2017/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A23C9/146, A23J1/20, C07K14/79, C07K1/18, C12N9/08
[2015/21]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Molkeproteintrennung aus einem Milchmedium[2017/14]
English:Process of whey protein separation from milk medium[2017/14]
French:Procédé de séparation de protéines de lactosérum à partir d'un support de lait[2017/14]
Former [2015/21]Verfahren zur Molkeproteintrennung aus einem Milchmedium und Vorrichtung zu dessen Durchführung
Former [2015/21]Process of whey protein separation from milk medium and apparatus for its implementation
Former [2015/21]Procédé de séparation de protéines de lactosérum à partir d'un support de lait et appareil pour sa mise en oeuvre
Examination procedure25.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/21]
18.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2017Fee for grant paid
04.04.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.04.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)20.02.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
LU27.10.2017
MT27.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/36]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
LU27.10.2017
CH31.10.2017
LI31.10.2017
Former [2018/29]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
MC17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/13]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
SM17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2018/10]AT17.05.2017
CZ17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
RO17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/50]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
RS17.05.2017
BG17.08.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Former [2017/49]AT17.05.2017
ES17.05.2017
FI17.05.2017
HR17.05.2017
NO17.08.2017
GR18.08.2017
IS17.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2272378  (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK]) [X] 1,3,4,7,8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0130] * * example - * * figure - * [I] 2,5,6,9-14;
 [IDA]US4791193  (OKONOGI SHIGEO [JP], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 9, line 25 * * example - * [A] 10-14;
 [IDA]US5516675  (UCHIDA TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [ID] 1-9 * column 1, line 1 - column 6, line 30 * * example - * [A] 10-14;
 [IA]EP1087828  (UPFRONT CHROMATOGRAPHY AS [DK]) [I] 10-14 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0066]; example - * * figure - * [A] 1-9;
 [XAI]CN101032671  (FANG YAMIN [CN]) [X] 10,11 * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 2 - page 4, paragraph 1 * * figure 1 * [A] 1-9 [I] 12-14;
 [XAI]US4976865  (SANCHEZ VICTOR [FR], et al) [X] 10 * column 1, line 1 - column 9, line 12 * * examples 1-2 * * figures 1-3 * [A] 1-9 [I] 11-14;
 [XI]EP0352678  (SNOW BRAND MILK PROD CO LTD [JP]) [X] 10,11 * column 1, line 1 - column 7, line 35 * * example - * * figure - * [I] 1-9
 [I]  - GEOFFREY N. BROWN ET AL, "Multi-cycle recovery of lactoferrin and lactoperoxidase from crude whey using fimbriated high-capacity magnetic cation exchangers and a novel "rotor-stator" high-gradient magnetic separator", BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, (20130622), vol. 110, no. 6, doi:10.1002/bit.24842, ISSN 0006-3592, pages 1714 - 1725, XP055174347 [I] 1-14 * page 1714, column 1, line 1 - page 1725, column 1, line 21 * * figure - *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/bit.24842
by applicantUS4436658
 US4791193
 US5516675
 US5596082
 US7932069
 US5919913
 CZ23725U
 US2005220953
 US6942806
    - LEVAY. P.F.; VILJOEN, M., HEMATOL. J., (1995), vol. 80, pages 252 - 267,
    - GUTTERIDGE, J. M.; PATERSON, S. K.; SEGAL, A. W.; HALLIWELL, B., BIOCHEM. J., (1981), vol. 199, pages 259 - 261,
    - TUCCARI, G.; BARRESI, G., BIOMETALS, (2011), vol. 24, pages 775 - 784,
    - OSTDAL, H.; BJERRUM, M. J.; PEDERSEN, J. A; ANDERSEN, H. J., J. AGRIC. FOOD CHEM., (2000), vol. 48, pages 3939 - 3944,
    - SANCHEZ, L.; PEIRO, J. M.; CASTILLO, H.; PEREZ, M. D.; ENA, J. M.; CALVO, M. J., FOOD SCI., (1992), vol. 57, pages 873 - 879,
    - HATTI-KAUL, R.; MATTIASSON, B., Isolation of proteins, MARCEL DEKKER, INC., (2003),
    - C.J. FEE; A. CHAND, SEP. PURIF. TECHNOL., (2006), vol. 48, pages 143 - 149,
    - SAFARIK, I.; SAFARIKOVA, M., BIOMAGN. RES. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 17, pages 1 - 17,
    - FRANZREB, M.; SIEMANN-HERZBERG, M.; HOBLEY, T. J.; THOMAS, O. R. T., APPL. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (2006), vol. 70, pages 505 - 516,
    - HEEBOLL-NIELSEN, A.; JUSTESEN, S. F. L.; HOBLEY, T. J.; THOMAS, O. R. T., SEP. SCI. TECHNOL., (2004), vol. 39, pages 2891 - 2914,
    - HEEBOLL-NIELSEN, A.; JUSTESEN, S. F. L.; THOMAS, O. R. T., J. BIOTECHNOL., (2004), vol. 113, pages 247 - 262,
    - CHEN, L.; GUO, C.; GUAN, Y.; LIU, H., SEP. PURIF. TECHNOL., (2007), vol. 56, pages 168 - 174,