blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2886029 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2886029



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 250
08.11.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
04.01.2017 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
08.12.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
03.11.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
03.11.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
20.10.2016 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
22.09.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 6
22.09.2016 Annexes in respect of a request for a change Search / examination 40
22.09.2016 Request for change of name - applicant Search / examination 2
21.09.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
09.08.2016 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
09.08.2016 Text intended for grant Search / examination 27
09.08.2016 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 27
30.06.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
22.02.2016 CDS Clean up - amended applicant details Search / examination 1
18.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
18.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
18.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
17.12.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.12.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
17.12.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 5
17.12.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 6
17.12.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
12.12.2015 Annex Search / examination 1
12.12.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
12.12.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
29.06.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
28.05.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
16.04.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.04.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 4
16.04.2015 European search report Search / examination 2
07.04.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
04.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
18.11.2014 Description Search / examination 17
18.11.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Drawings Search / examination 6
18.11.2014 Priority document Search / examination 28
18.11.2014 Priority search results Search / examination 8
18.11.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 8