Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2886029 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410790743 EP14003876



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104433950BGlobal Dossier 18.07.2017B
CN104433950 25.03.2015A
Priority number Date
DE102013021277 17.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2886029Global Dossier 04.01.2017B1
EP2886029 24.06.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013021277 17.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
AU2014277698B 14.02.2019B2
AU2014277698 02.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013021277 17.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE102013021277 02.07.2015A1
Priority number Date
DE102013021277 17.12.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
NZ702512 26.08.2016A
Priority number Date
DE102013021277 17.12.2013