Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886029

EP2886029 - Portable hard surface suction device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Database last updated on 22.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.12.2016
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nilfisk A/S
Sognevej 25
2605 Brøndby / DK
[2016/47]
Former [2015/26]For all designated states
Nilfisk- Advance A/S
Sognevej 25
2605 Brøndby / DK
Inventor(s)01 / Krogsgaard, Holger
Vaelddalen 15
8370 Hadsten / DK
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/26]
Application number, filing date14003876.118.11.2014
[2015/26]
Priority number, dateDE2013102127717.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013021277
[2015/26]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886029
Date:24.06.2015
Language:DE
[2015/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2886029
Date:04.01.2017
Language:DE
[2017/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47L1/05, A47L11/40, A47L7/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/04]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Tragbares Hartflächenabsauggerät[2015/26]
English:Portable hard surface suction device[2015/26]
French:Appareil portable d'aspiration pour surfaces dures[2015/26]
Examination procedure17.12.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/04]
09.08.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2016Fee for grant paid
21.09.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.11.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)05.10.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU18.11.2014
CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MT04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
MT04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/33]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
MC04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2018/14]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SI04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/51]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
SM04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/50]CZ04.01.2017
DK04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/49]CZ04.01.2017
EE04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RO04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
SK04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ04.01.2017
ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Former [2017/40]ES04.01.2017
FI04.01.2017
HR04.01.2017
LT04.01.2017
LV04.01.2017
NL04.01.2017
PL04.01.2017
RS04.01.2017
SE04.01.2017
BG04.04.2017
NO04.04.2017
GR05.04.2017
IS04.05.2017
PT04.05.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US6968593  (LENKIEWICZ KENNETH M [US], et al) [X] 1-2,7 * column 4, line 59 - column 8, line 31; figures 1-3 *;
 [X]US4776058  (GARNER DAVID P [CA], et al) [X] 1-3,7-8 * column 7, line 60 - line 34; figures 3,4,17 *;
 [X]CN102772168  (HOULIN ZHU) [X] 1-2 * figure 1 *;
 [DA]DE102008004965  (KAERCHER GMBH & CO KG ALFRED [DE]) [DA] 1-10 * the whole document *
by applicantDE102008004965