EP2873317 - Litter box for pets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carluccio, Marcello Via Cappelline, 42 35020 Terrassa Padovana (PD) / IT | [2015/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2015/21] | Representative(s) | Maiello, Helenio Francesco Studio Ing. Ranieri Marino Strada del Pasubio, 146 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | Maiello, Helenio Francesco Studio Ing. Ranieri Marino Contrà Paolo Lioy, 24 36100 Vicenza / IT | Application number, filing date | 14003884.5 | 19.11.2014 | [2015/21] | Priority number, date | IT2013PD00313 | 19.11.2013 Original published format: IT PD20130313 | [2015/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2873317 | Date: | 20.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2015 | Classification | IPC: | A01K1/01 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A01K1/0114 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] |
Former [2015/21] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Streukiste für Haustiere | [2015/21] | English: | Litter box for pets | [2015/21] | French: | Boîte de litière pour animaux domestiques | [2015/21] | Examination procedure | 18.11.2015 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 22.03.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/46] | 02.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.03.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.03.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2017 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XDYI]US4444148 (LANDER HARRY L [US]) [XD] 1-4,9 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 66 * * column 3, lines 17-68 * * column 5, line 39 - column 7, line 26 * * figures 1-6 * [Y] 8 [I] 5-7; | [XDI]CH688428 (CATHOMAS JOSEF [CH]) [XD] 1,7,8 * column 1, line 48 - column 3, line 8 * * figures 1-5 * [I] 2-6,9; | [Y]US2007283895 (SKOVRON TOBI [AU], et al) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0032] - [0038] * * figures 1-4 *; | [AD]NL9500326 (THEO JOHAN BUYTENHEK [NL], et al) [AD] 1-9 * abstract *; | [AD]EP1488690 (UNICHARM PETCARE CORP [JP]) [AD] 1-9 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 35 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0020] - [0023] * * figures 1-3 * | by applicant | NL9500326 | CH688428 | EP1488690 | US4444148 |