Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2888975

EP2888975 - Work chair with a synchronous mechanism and flexing spring [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.09.2018
Database last updated on 22.07.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  29.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.06.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Klöber GmbH
Hauptstrasse 1
88696 Owingen / DE
[2015/27]
Inventor(s)01 / Bernauer, Jörg
Linzgaustraße 3
88696 Owingen / DE
02 / Riester, Manfred
Kirchstraße 9a
88696 Owingen / DE
 [2015/27]
Representative(s)Riebling, Peter , et al
Patentanwalt, Rennerle 10
88131 Lindau / DE
[2015/27]
Application number, filing date14004054.402.12.2014
[2015/27]
Priority number, dateDE2013102212228.12.2013         Original published format: DE102013022122
[2015/27]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2888975
Date:01.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2888975
Date:01.11.2017
Language:DE
[2017/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/032
[2015/27]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/39]
Former [2015/27]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Arbeitsstuhl mit Synchronmechanik und Biegefeder[2015/27]
English:Work chair with a synchronous mechanism and flexing spring[2015/27]
French:Siège de travail à mécanisme synchrone et ressort spiral[2015/27]
Examination procedure18.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/39]
20.10.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.06.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.07.2017Fee for grant paid
18.07.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)02.08.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.12.2014
CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
IE02.12.2017
LU02.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
[2019/31]
Former [2019/30]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MC01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
IE02.12.2017
LU02.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/52]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SI01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
IE02.12.2017
LU02.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/50]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
IE02.12.2017
LU02.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/45]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
IE02.12.2017
LU02.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/43]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
MT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
LU02.12.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/40]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RO01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/39]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
IT01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/37]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
PL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
SM01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY01.11.2017
CZ01.11.2017
DK01.11.2017
EE01.11.2017
ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
SK01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/24]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
LV01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
BG01.02.2018
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/23]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
HR01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
RS01.11.2017
SE01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
GR02.02.2018
IS01.03.2018
Former [2018/22]ES01.11.2017
FI01.11.2017
LT01.11.2017
NL01.11.2017
NO01.02.2018
Documents cited:Search[XAI]DE3530868  (KUSCH CO SITZMOEBEL [DE]) [X] 1,3,5,7-9 * column 2, line 43 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-4 * [A] 2,6 [I] 10;
 [X]DE29704906U  (INTERSTUHL BUEROMOEBEL GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,7 * page 3, line 16 - page 4, line 29; figures 1-2 *;
 [X]JPH07184741  (ITOKI CREBIO CORP) [X] 1 * abstract *
by applicantCA2645964
 WO2007110729