Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3028848

EP3028848 - LAYERED MATERIALS AND THEIR USE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  16.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2018Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.12.2018  [2018/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
surfactor Germany GmbH
Graf-Beust-Allee 17
45141 Essen / DE
[2016/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Lipponen, Juha
Matkaseläntie 4
82500 Kitee / FI
02 / Silventoinen, Ilpo
Piikkeenniementie 15
59800 Kesälahti / FI
 [2016/23]
Representative(s)von Renesse, Dorothea , et al
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Mönchenwerther Str. 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
[2016/23]
Application number, filing date14004072.603.12.2014
[2016/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3028848
Date:08.06.2016
Language:EN
[2016/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2015
ClassificationInternational:B32B11/00, C09D195/00, C09J195/00, C08L61/00, C08L95/00, C08L91/06, C08K3/34, C08K5/01, C08K5/09, D06N5/00
[2016/23]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/03]
Former [2016/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:SCHICHTMATERIALIEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG[2016/23]
English:LAYERED MATERIALS AND THEIR USE[2016/23]
French:MATÉRIAUX EN COUCHES ET LEUR UTILISATION[2016/23]
Examination procedure03.12.2014Date on which the examining division has become responsible
08.12.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.12.2016Examination requested  [2017/03]
03.07.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2018/51]
03.08.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US3276906  (NIELSEN CARL L) [X] 1-16 * column 1, line 30 - line 37; claim 1 * * column 2, lines 4-9 * * column 3, line 3 - line 10 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]US5209886  (SIMONS MICHAEL W [ZA]) [X] 1-16 * example 1 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]US2552900  (MCCOY PAUL E) [X] 1-17 * claims 1-6 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]US3726739  (GUTTE R, et al) [X] 1-17 * example 4 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17;
 [XY]GB626852  (TEKWOOD INC) [X] 1-17 * figures 2,4; claims 1-9 * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17;
 [Y]US5235518  (MAEKAWA SACHIO [JP], et al) [Y] 1-17 * column 8, line 30 - line 34; claim 1 * * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2545603  (BYERS RALPH J, et al) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *
 [XYI]  - J. CONNAN, "Use and trade of bitumen in antiquity and prehistory: molecular archaeology reveals secrets of past civilizations", PHILOSOPHICAL TRANSACTIONS OF THE ROYAL SOCIETY B: BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (19990129), vol. 354, no. 1379, doi:10.1098/rstb.1999.0358, ISSN 0962-8436, pages 33 - 50, XP055018182 [X] 1-8,10-12,14,17 * page 33; tables 1,2 * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0002] * * the whole document * [Y] 1-17 [I] 9,13,15,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1098/rstb.1999.0358