Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3028848


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.11.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
02.08.2018 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
03.02.2018 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
10.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
16.12.2016 The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established
16.12.2016 Request for examination filed published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
16.12.2016 Change - designated states published on  18.01.2017  [2017/03]
09.12.2016 Amendment by applicant
07.06.2016 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  08.06.2016  [2016/23]
09.12.2014 Change - representative