Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2886078

EP2886078 - Dental implant system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  24.03.2017
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  03.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  18.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2017Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.05.2017  [2017/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
M'Gaides, Didier
77 Bd. Louis Pasquet
13300 Salon de Provence / FR
[2015/26]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2015/26]
Representative(s)Barbot, Willy
Simodoro-ip
82, rue Sylvabelle
13006 Marseille / FR
[N/P]
Former [2015/26]Barbot, Willy
SIMODORO-ip
1 place des Prêcheurs
13100 Aix-en-Provence / FR
Application number, filing date14004297.918.12.2014
[2015/26]
Priority number, dateFR2013000299218.12.2013         Original published format: FR 1302992
[2015/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2886078
Date:24.06.2015
Language:FR
[2015/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.04.2015
ClassificationInternational:A61C8/00
[2015/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/06]
Former [2015/26]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Zahnimplantatsystem[2015/26]
English:Dental implant system[2015/26]
French:Système implantaire dentaire[2015/26]
Examination procedure18.12.2015Examination requested  [2016/06]
29.06.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.12.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.02.2017Fee for grant paid
20.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
13.03.2017Application withdrawn by applicant  [2017/18]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent
20.02.2017Request for further processing filed
20.02.2017Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.03.2017Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013288200  (BATTULA SUNEEL RANGA SAI [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 14, 16, 27, 43-45, 49, 51, 59-61 *;
 [A]WO2010089698  (MID CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-5, 12-18 *;
 [A]DE10026306  (TUTOGEN MEDICAL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figure - *;
 [A]US4370134  (ROBERTS HAROLD D [CA]) [A] 1-10 * figure - *