Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2854324

EP2854324 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MOBILE STATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/14]Communication system and mobile station apparatus
[2017/41]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  15.06.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  29.01.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  16.01.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.09.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  09.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP
[2015/14]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamada, Shohei
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
02 / Uemura, Katsunari
c/o Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka, 545-8522 / JP
 [2015/14]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[2015/14]
Application number, filing date14004393.628.07.2009
[2015/14]
Priority number, dateJP2008027204822.10.2008         Original published format: JP 2008272048
[2015/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2854324
Date:01.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/14]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2854324
Date:29.04.2015
[2015/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2854324
Date:18.07.2018
Language:EN
[2018/29]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H04L5/00, H04W48/12
[2015/18]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/40]
Former [2015/14]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kommunikationssystem und Mobilstationsvorrichtung dafür[2018/08]
English:COMMUNICATION SYSTEM AND MOBILE STATION APPARATUS[2017/41]
French:Système de communication et appareil de station mobile[2018/08]
Former [2015/14]Kommunikationssystem und Mobilstationsvorrichtung dafür
Former [2015/14]Communication system and mobile station apparatus
Former [2015/14]Système de communication et appareil de station mobile
Examination procedure17.08.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.08.2015Examination requested  [2015/40]
07.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.04.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.01.2018Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
30.01.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.06.2018Fee for grant paid
06.06.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
06.06.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09821866.2  / EP2346295
Opposition(s)23.04.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 07
22.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 08
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SI18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
IE28.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
[2019/37]
Former [2019/33]AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
IE28.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/26]AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
DK18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
SM18.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/23]AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
EE18.07.2018
ES18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
MC18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
SK18.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/22]AT18.07.2018
CZ18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
RO18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/21]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
IT18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/17]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
LU28.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/12]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
LV18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/11]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
HR18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/10]AT18.07.2018
FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
PL18.07.2018
SE18.07.2018
BG18.10.2018
NO18.10.2018
GR19.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/08]FI18.07.2018
LT18.07.2018
NO18.10.2018
IS18.11.2018
Former [2019/07]LT18.07.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008247375  (MUHAREMOVIC TARIK [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 4, paragraph 32 - page 5, paragraph 36 * * page 6, paragraph 40 * * page 7, paragraph 48 - paragraph 53 * * claims 1-25 *;
 [A]WO2006116102  (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 5 - page 3, paragraph 9 * * page 17, paragraph 71 - paragraph 72 *;
 [A]  - ERICSSON, "A discussion on some technology components for LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-082024 {LTE-ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY COMPONENTS}, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080514), vol. RAN WG1, no. Kansas City, US; 20080505, XP050488853 [A] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 1.2 * * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [2.1.2] *
 [AD]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (E-UTRA) and Evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (E-UTRAN); Overall description; Stage 2 (Release 8)", 3GPP STANDARD; 3GPP TS 36.300, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080301), no. V8.4.0, pages 1 - 126, XP050377579 [AD] 1-10 * the whole document *