Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2854324 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2854324



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 527
22.05.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.08.2018 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
30.07.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
21.06.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
06.06.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.06.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.06.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
06.06.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
06.06.2018 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
30.01.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
30.01.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
30.01.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
30.01.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 77
30.01.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 77
18.01.2018 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
10.01.2018 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
10.01.2018 Claims Search / examination 3
10.01.2018 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
12.09.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
12.09.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
12.09.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 77
12.09.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 77
12.04.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
12.04.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
12.04.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
07.12.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
07.12.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
01.12.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
17.08.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
17.08.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
17.08.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 5
17.08.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
17.08.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
06.05.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
15.04.2015 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
31.03.2015 European search opinion Search / examination 3
31.03.2015 European search report Search / examination 3
23.03.2015 Search started Search / examination 1
04.03.2015 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
05.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
23.12.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
23.12.2014 Description Search / examination 60
23.12.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Drawings Search / examination 12
23.12.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) Search / examination 8
21.05.2010 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 42