Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2801527

EP2801527 - Paragliding chute [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.02.2017
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spekon Sächsische Spezialkonfektion GmbH
Nordstrasse 40
02782 Seifhennersdorf / DE
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Koser, Thomas
Schwabenweg 3
72218 Wildberg / DE
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Seltmann, Reinhard , et al
Pätzelt - Seltmann - Hofmann
Patentanwälte
August-Bebel-Straße 63
03099 Kolkwitz / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/46]Seltmann, Reinhard , et al
Pätzelt - Seltmann - Hofmann Patentanwälte August-Bebel-Straße 63
03099 Kolkwitz / DE
Application number, filing date14075028.207.05.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateDE2013100674420.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013006744
[2014/46]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2801527
Date:12.11.2014
Language:DE
[2014/46]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2801527
Date:22.04.2015
Language:DE
[2015/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2801527
Date:06.04.2016
Language:DE
[2016/14]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:B64D17/02, B64C31/036, B64D17/18
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
TitleGerman:Sprunggleitschirm[2014/46]
English:Paragliding chute[2014/46]
French:Parapente[2014/46]
Examination procedure07.05.2014Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority
18.11.2014Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0001
02.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
30.11.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.12.2015Fee for grant paid
24.12.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.01.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.01.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)10.01.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/11]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.05.2014
AL06.04.2016
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
MT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU07.05.2014
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
MT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
TR06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/38]HU07.05.2014
BG06.04.2016
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
MT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/32]HU07.05.2014
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
MT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2018/30]HU07.05.2014
CY06.04.2016
CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
MK06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
LU07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/26]CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SI06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
IE07.05.2016
BE31.05.2016
FR06.06.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/11]CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
SM06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/10]CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
SK06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ06.04.2016
DK06.04.2016
EE06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RO06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/07]DK06.04.2016
ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
MC06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2017/04]ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
IT06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/52]ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
SE06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/51]ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
GR07.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
PT08.08.2016
Former [2016/50]ES06.04.2016
FI06.04.2016
HR06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
LV06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
RS06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI06.04.2016
LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
PL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/48]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
IS06.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT06.04.2016
NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
NO06.07.2016
Former [2016/44]NL06.04.2016
BE31.05.2016
Former [2016/37]BE31.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]FR2722471  (PARACHUTES DE FRANCE SA [FR]) [AD] 1-7 * figure 5a *;
 [AD]US2003183724  (PRESTON DANIEL [US]) [AD] 1-7 * figure 5 *
by applicantEP1566336
 CZ285165
 WO2009043823
 US2003183724
 US2008308680
 FR2722471