Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2792928

EP2792928 - Handling machine for containers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.09.2016
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstraße 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
[2014/43]
Inventor(s)01 / Hafner, Dieter
c/o Krones AG
Böhmerwaldstrasse 5
93073 Neutraubling / DE
 [2014/43]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2015/44]
Former [2014/43]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14150012.402.01.2014
[2014/43]
Priority number, dateDE20131020668215.04.2013         Original published format: DE102013206682
[2014/43]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2792928
Date:22.10.2014
Language:DE
[2014/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2792928
Date:28.10.2015
Language:DE
[2015/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16P1/02, B65C9/00, F16P3/08
[2014/43]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/23]
Former [2014/43]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Behandlungsmaschine für Behälter[2014/43]
English:Handling machine for containers[2014/43]
French:Machine de traitement pour récipients[2014/43]
Examination procedure20.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/23]
25.06.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.09.2015Fee for grant paid
09.09.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.09.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.06.2015
Opposition(s)29.07.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/40]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU02.01.2014
AL28.10.2015
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/45]HU02.01.2014
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
TR28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2018/38]HU02.01.2014
BG28.10.2015
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2018/32]HU02.01.2014
CY28.10.2015
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2018/28]HU02.01.2014
CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MK28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2017/47]CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
MT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2017/07]CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
IE02.01.2016
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/49]CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SI28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/42]CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
MC28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/39]CZ28.10.2015
DK28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
LU02.01.2016
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/38]CZ28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
SM28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/36]CZ28.10.2015
EE28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RO28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
SK28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/34]CZ28.10.2015
ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/25]ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
LV28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/24]ES28.10.2015
FI28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
PL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
GR29.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
PT29.02.2016
Former [2016/23]ES28.10.2015
HR28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
RS28.10.2015
SE28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/22]ES28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NL28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
IS28.02.2016
Former [2016/21]ES28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
NO28.01.2016
Former [2016/20]ES28.10.2015
LT28.10.2015
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2010099822  (SIDEL SPA [IT]; GIULIANI MATTIA [IT]; FERRI MARCO [IT]) [Y] 1-14 * pages 1,6-13; figures 1-6 *;
 [Y]GB1533573  (DANIELS STROUD LTD) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 10 - line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]WO2013001551  (KOSME S R L UNIPERSONALE [IT]; BRIVIO FABIO [IT]; CATTABRIGA DENIS [IT) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *