blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2816637

EP2816637 - Rechargeable battery [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.04.2020
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.05.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.02.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  10.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.07.2022Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 10.08.2022  [2022/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu
Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2014/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Kim Dukjung
c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/24]
Former [2014/52]01 / Kim, Dukjung
c/o Samsung SDI Co., Ltd.
150-20, Gongse-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2019/24]
Former [2014/52]Walaski, Jan Filip, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14150160.103.01.2014
[2014/52]
Priority number, dateKR2013007043819.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130070438
[2014/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2816637
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2816637
Date:12.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2014
ClassificationIPC:H01M2/22, H01M2/26, H01M2/34
[2014/52]
CPC:
H01M50/528 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/581 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/103 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/176 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/534 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/55 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/553 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/567 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M50/578 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/583 (EP,CN,KR,US); H01M2200/103 (EP,KR,US); H01M2200/20 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
Former [2014/52]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wiederaufladbare Batterie[2014/52]
English:Rechargeable battery[2014/52]
French:Batterie rechargeable[2014/52]
Examination procedure23.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/31]
14.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.02.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2019Fee for grant paid
30.04.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.11.2017
Opposition(s)13.03.2020No opposition filed within time limit [2020/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
18.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU03.01.2014
AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CY12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
MK12.06.2019
MT12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
IE03.01.2020
LU03.01.2020
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
[2022/32]
Former [2022/27]HU03.01.2014
AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CY12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
MT12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
IE03.01.2020
LU03.01.2020
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
Former [2021/08]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
IE03.01.2020
LU03.01.2020
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
Former [2020/51]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
LU03.01.2020
BE31.01.2020
CH31.01.2020
LI31.01.2020
Former [2020/46]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
LU03.01.2020
Former [2020/39]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
MC12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/36]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/24]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
PL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SI12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
PT14.10.2019
IS24.02.2020
Former [2020/22]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
DK12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/17]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
TR12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/13]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
SM12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/12]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
IT12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
IS12.10.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/11]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
EE12.06.2019
ES12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
SK12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/10]AL12.06.2019
AT12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RO12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
PT14.10.2019
Former [2020/09]AL12.06.2019
CZ12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2020/07]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
NL12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/51]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
BG12.09.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/50]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
LV12.06.2019
RS12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
GR13.09.2019
Former [2019/49]AL12.06.2019
FI12.06.2019
HR12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/48]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
SE12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Former [2019/47]FI12.06.2019
LT12.06.2019
NO12.09.2019
Documents cited:Search[X]EP2495785  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2 * figure 2 *;
 [X]EP2515363  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 10-15* the whole document *;
 [X]EP2544264  (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]EP2579357  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0019] , [0051] , [0067] , [0068] , [0069] *;
 [XP]EP2624327  (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR], et al) [XP] 1-15 * the whole document *
ExaminationEP2793295
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.