EP2784260 - Fire-resistant building element, frame construction thereof and method of manufacturing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2016 [2016/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sapa Building System AB 574 81 Vetlanda / SE | [2014/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andersson, Andreas Skogslundsvägen 15 574 34 Vetlanda / SE | 02 /
Isaksson, Göran Donationsstigen 5 574 39 Vetlanda / SE | [2014/40] | Representative(s) | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 Löjtnantsgatan 21 114 85 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | Zacco Sweden AB Valhallavägen 117 P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2014/40] | Melin Granberg, Linda Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 14150271.6 | 07.01.2014 | [2014/40] | Priority number, date | SE20130050399 | 28.03.2013 Original published format: SE 1350399 | [2014/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2784260 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/263, E06B5/16 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
E06B3/26303 (EP);
E06B5/161 (EP);
E06B2003/26321 (EP);
E06B2003/26394 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Feuerhemmendes Bauelement, Rahmen und Verfahren dafür | [2014/40] | English: | Fire-resistant building element, frame construction thereof and method of manufacturing | [2014/40] | French: | Élément de construction résistant au feu, cadre de construction et méthode de fabrication | [2014/40] | Examination procedure | 26.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/17] | 14.12.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.04.2015 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE19504601 (WICONA BAUSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-12 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,13,14; | [ID]EP1961905 (HUECK EDUARD GMBH CO KG [DE]) [ID] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | GB2190125 | EP1582686 | EP0927809 | EP1961905 | EP1327741 |