Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2884445

EP2884445 - User participation concert making system and method for providing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  03.06.2016
Database last updated on 17.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.06.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.07.2016  [2016/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JJS Media Co., LTD.
58, 30-gil, Gangnam-daero Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-131 / KR
[2015/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Lee, Jae Seok
No. 201-503, Hyoseong Baeknyeongayak 2-danji
10, Gosan-ro, Suseong-gu
706-968 Daegu / KR
 [2015/25]
Representative(s)V.O.
P.O. Box 87930
2508 DH Den Haag / NL
[N/P]
Former [2015/25]Jansen, Cornelis Marinus , et al
V.O.
Johan de Wittlaan 7
2517 JR Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date14150835.810.01.2014
[2015/25]
Priority number, dateKR2013015633816.12.2013         Original published format: KR 20130156338
[2015/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2884445
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06Q30/02
[2015/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/25]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zur Durchführung von Konzerten mit Benutzerbeteiligung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung davon[2015/25]
English:User participation concert making system and method for providing the same[2015/25]
French:Système de fabrication de concert de participation d'utilisateur et son procédé de fabrication[2015/25]
Examination procedure07.03.2014Examination requested  [2015/25]
18.12.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/27]
25.01.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2016/27]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201603   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search   [] - No relevant documents disclosed,