Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2759604

EP2759604 - Control nucleic acids for multiple parameters [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Database last updated on 13.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For:AL  AT  BE  BG  CH  CY  CZ  DK  EE  ES  FI  FR  GB  GR  HR  HU  IE  IS  IT  LI  LT  LU  LV  MC  MK  MT  NL  NO  PL  PT  RO  RS  SE  SI  SK  SM  TR 
F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
For:DE 
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhoferstrasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[2014/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Eickhoff, Meike
Schoengrund 36
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
02 / Hitziger, Niclas
Oberseeburg 56
6006 Luzern / CH
03 / Zimmermann, Dirk
Baarerstrasse 58
6300 Zug / CH
04 / Fiss, Ellen H.
908 Polk Street
Albany, CA 94706 / US
05 / Will, Stephen, Gordon
1832 Woodhaven Way
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
06 / Glaubitz, Joachim
Rossweid 7
5643 Sins / CH
 [2016/38]
Former [2014/31]01 / Eickhoff, Meike
Schoengrund 36
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
02 / Hitziger, Niclas
Oberseeburg 56
6006 Luzern / CH
03 / Zimmermann, Dirk
Chamerstrasse 68 C
6300 Zug / CH
04 / Fiss, Ellen H.
908 Polk Street
Albany, CA 94706 / US
05 / Will, Stephen, Gordon
1832 Woodhaven Way
Oakland, CA 94611 / US
06 / Glaubitz, Joachim
Rossweid 7
5643 Sins / CH
Representative(s)Merkel, Patrick , et al
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
[2016/38]
Former [2014/31]Merkel, Patrick
Forrenstrasse 2
6343 Rotkreuz / CH
Application number, filing date14150845.727.07.2011
[2014/31]
Priority number, dateUS20100368979P29.07.2010         Original published format: US 368979 P
EP2010017553807.09.2010         Original published format: EP 10175538
[2014/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2759604
Date:30.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/31]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2759604
Date:13.08.2014
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2759604
Date:21.09.2016
Language:EN
[2016/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/38]
Former [2014/31]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kontrollnukleinsäure für mehrere Parameter[2014/31]
English:Control nucleic acids for multiple parameters[2014/31]
French:Acides nucléiques de contrôle pour paramètres multiples[2014/31]
Examination procedure13.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
09.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.08.2016Fee for grant paid
12.08.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
12.08.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11738216.8  / EP2598656
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110738216) is  08.11.2013
Opposition(s)22.06.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.05.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
08.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
09.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 05
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU27.07.2011
AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CY21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU27.07.2011
AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2019/30]AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
MC21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2018/47]AL21.09.2016
AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/52]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SI21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/34]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
DK21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/32]AT21.09.2016
BE21.09.2016
CZ21.09.2016
EE21.09.2016
FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
PL21.09.2016
RO21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
SK21.09.2016
SM21.09.2016
BG21.12.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
IS21.01.2017
PT23.01.2017
Former [2017/13]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
LV21.09.2016
NL21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/11]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
GR22.12.2016
Former [2017/10]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
RS21.09.2016
SE21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/09]FI21.09.2016
LT21.09.2016
NO21.12.2016
Former [2017/07]LT21.09.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]WO2009117537  (SIEMENS HEALTHCARE DIAGNOSTICS [US], et al) [Y] 1-13 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - MENG Q ET AL, "Automated multiplex assay system for simultaneous detection of hepatitis B virus DNA, hepatitis C virus RNA, and human immunodeficiency virus type 1 RNA", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010801), vol. 39, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1128/JCM.39.8.2937-2945.2001, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 2937 - 2945, XP002193784 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * abstract, p. 2937, col. 2, para. 2 and 3, p. 2938, col. 1 - col. 2, Table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.39.8.2937-2945.2001
 [Y]  - ROCHE MOLECULAR SYSTEMS, "cobas TM TaqScreen MPX Test for use on the cobas s 201 system", 20091124, (20091124), pages 1 - 60, XP007915685 [Y] 1-13 * p. 5-8, 11, 23, Table 1, Table 2 * * the whole document *
 [Y]  - QUAN P L ET AL, "Rapid sequence-based diagnosis of viral infection", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, vol. 79, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.ANTIVIRAL.2008.02.002, ISSN 0166-3542, (20080701), pages 1 - 5, (20080307), XP022654492 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * p. 3, col. 1, para. 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2008.02.002
 [Y]  - WATZINGER F ET AL, "Real-time quantitative PCR assays for detection and monitoring of pathogenic human viruses in immunosuppressed pediatric patients", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL MICROBIOLOGY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (20041101), vol. 42, no. 11, doi:10.1128/JCM.42.11.5189-5198.2004, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 5189 - 5198, XP002552355 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * e.g. abstract, p. 5189, col. 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.11.5189-5198.2004
 [Y]  - MARKUS STÖCHER ET AL, "A convenient approach to the generation of multiple internal control DNA for a panel of real-time PCR assays", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGICAL METHODS, (20030301), vol. 108, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0166-0934(02)00266-5, ISSN 0166-0934, pages 1 - 8, XP055038510 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * abstract, p. 4, Fig. 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0166-0934(02)00266-5
 [Y]  - HUANG J ET AL, "A novel real-time multiplex reverse transcriptase-polymerase chain reaction for the detection of HIV-1 RNA by using dual-specific armored RNA as internal control", INTERVIROLOGY, KARGER, XX, (20080101), vol. 51, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1159/000119119, ISSN 0300-5526, pages 42 - 49, XP009110430 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * * abstract, p. 43, col. 2, last para. *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000119119
Examination   - N. A. Lister ET AL, "Validation of Roche COBAS Amplicor Assay for Detection of Chlamydia trachomatis in Rectal and Pharyngeal Specimens by an omp1 PCR Assay", Journal of clinical microbiology, (20040101), vol. 42, no. 1, doi:10.1128/JCM.42.1.239-241.2004, ISSN 0095-1137, pages 239 - 241, XP055180688

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JCM.42.1.239-241.2004
    - S.J. De Martino ET AL, "Detection of Chlamydia trachomatis DNA using MagNA Pure DNA extraction and Cobas Amplicor CT/NG amplification", Clinical Microbiology and Infection, (20060601), vol. 12, no. 6, doi:10.1111/j.1469-0691.2006.01437.x, ISSN 1198-743X, pages 576 - 579, XP055180687

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1469-0691.2006.01437.x
by applicantWO9804730
 US5386024
 EP1201753
 DE3734442
 WO0137291
 US4458066
 WO0212263
 US4683202
 US4683195
 US4800159
 US4965188
 WO9001069
 EP0439182
 WO9208808
 US5130238
 EP0910643
 WO2008046612
 US5455170
 WO9746707
 WO9746714
 WO9746712
 US5035996
    - SWANSON ET AL., J. CLIN. MICROBIOL., (2004), vol. 42, pages 1863 - 1868
    - STOCHER ET AL., J. VIROL. METH., (2003), vol. 108, pages 1 - 8
    - VOGELSTEIN B. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. USA, (1979), vol. 76, pages 615 - 9
    - MARKO M. A ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1982), vol. 121, pages 382 - 387
    - JAKOBI R. ET AL., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1988), vol. 175, pages 196 - 201
    - ALDERTON R. P. ET AL., S., ANAL. BIOCHEM., (1992), vol. 201, pages 166 - 169
    - R. BOOM ET AL., J CLIN MICROBIOL., (1990), vol. 28, pages 495 - 503
    - NARANG S. A. ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1979), vol. 68, pages 90 - 98
    - BROWN E. L. ET AL., METHODS IN ENZYMOLOGY, (1979), vol. 68, pages 109 - 151
    - BEAUCAGE ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1981), vol. 22, page 1859
    - GAREGG ET AL., CHEM. SCR., (1985), vol. 25, pages 280 - 282
    - UHLMANN; PEYMAN, CHEMICAL REVIEWS, (1990), vol. 90, page 543
    - VERMA S.; ECKSTEIN F., ANNU. REV. BIOCHEM., (1998), vol. 67, pages 99 - 134
    - WU D. Y.; WALLACE R. B., GENOMICS, (1989), vol. 4, pages 560 - 69
    - BARANY F., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1991), vol. 88, pages 189 - 193
    - BARANY F., PCR METHODS AND APPLIC, (1991), vol. 1, pages 5 - 16
    - KWOH D.Y. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1989), vol. 86, pages 1173 - 1177
    - GUATELLI J.C. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1990), vol. 87, pages 1874 - 1878
    - WHELEN A. C.; PERSING D. H., ANNU. REV. MICROBIOL., (1996), vol. 50, pages 349 - 373
    - ABRAMSON R. D.; MYERS T. W., CURR OPIN BIOTECHNOL, (1993), vol. 4, pages 41 - 47
 WO1991GB00212