Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2802180

EP2802180 - Method for controlling D2D communication and corresponding controller device and mobile device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.11.2015  [2015/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Industrial Technology Research Institute
No. 195 - Sec. 4 Chung Hsing Road
Chutung Hsinchu 31040 / TW
[2014/46]
Inventor(s)01 / Chiu, Chun-Yuan
No. 1-14, Ln. 456
Guangdong Rd.
Neighborhood 41
Dalian Village, Pingtung City
Pingtung City Pingtung County 900 / TW
02 / Wang, Chun-Yen
No. 25, Ln. 318, Sec. 2
Anhe Rd., Neighborhood 3
Shinshun Village, Annon Dist.
709 Tainan City / TW
 [2014/46]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/46]
Application number, filing date14151232.715.01.2014
[2014/46]
Priority number, dateTW2013010983820.03.2013         Original published format: TW 102109838
US20131392979928.06.2013         Original published format: US201313929799
[2014/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2802180
Date:12.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.10.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W72/04, // H04W76/02
[2014/46]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Steuerung von D2D-Kommunikation und entsprechende Steuervorrichtung und mobile Vorrichtung[2014/46]
English:Method for controlling D2D communication and corresponding controller device and mobile device[2014/46]
French:Procédé de commande de communication D2D et dispositif de contrôleur correspondant et dispositif mobile[2014/46]
Examination procedure15.01.2014Examination requested  [2014/46]
13.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/45]
18.06.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2015/45]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]WO2012091420  (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR]; AHN JAE YOUNG [KR]; NOH TAEGYUN [KR];) [X] 1-4,9-11,16-19,25-28,33-35,40-43 * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,12,13,20,21,29,30,36,37,44,45 [I] 7,8,14,15,22-24,31,32,38,39,46-48;
 [E]US2014023008  (AHN JAE-YOUNG [KR] ET AL) [E] 1-4,9-11,16-19,25-28,33-35,40-43 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0014] - [0022] - [0027] , [0030] , [0059] , [0060] , [0064] - [0073] - [0077] , [0078] * * paragraphs [0082] , [0083]; claims 1-3,8 *;
 [XA]WO2012048464  (NOKIA CORP [FI]; GAO CHUNYAN [CN]; WANG HAIMING [CN]; CHARBIT GILLES [) [X] 1,9,16,25,33,40 * abstract * * page 16, line 11 - page 18, line 12 * * page 21, line 28 - page 22, line 23 * * claims 6,17 * [A] 2-8,10-15,17-24,26-32,34-39,41-48;
 [YA]WO2012129806  (RENESAS MOBILE CORP [JP]; GAO CHUNYAN [CN]; WANG HAIMING [CN]; CHARBIT) [Y] 5,6,12,13,20,21,29,30,36,37,44,45 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0007] - [0014] , [0017] , [0036] , [0042] , [0060] , [0063] , [0065] - [0081] - [0087] - [0089] - [0094]; claims 1,5,7,8 * [A] 1-4,7-11,14-19,22-28,31-35,38-43,46-48;
 [A]US2012129540  (HAKOLA SAMI-JUKKA [FI] ET AL) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0033] , [0043] , [0046] - [0054] - [0067] - [0069] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0082] - [0084]; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US2010093364  (RIBEIRO CASSIO [FI] ET AL) [A] 1-48 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0008] , [0030] , [0031] , [0040] , [0041] , [0051] - [0053]; claims 1,2,4 *