Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2742858

EP2742858 - Lumen morphology and vascular resistance measurements data collection systems, apparatus and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Light-Lab Imaging Inc.
One Technology Park Drive
Westford, MA 01886 / US
[2014/25]
Inventor(s)01 / Schmitt, Joseph
102 Brookside Drive
Andover, MA Massachusetts 01810 / US
02 / Friedman, Joel M.
93 Cross Street
Andover, MA Massachusetts 01810 / US
03 / Petroff, Christopher
227 Riverbend Drive
Groton, MA Massachusetts 01450 / US
04 / Elbasiony, Amr
8 Fletcher Street
Chelmsford, MA Massachusetts 01824 / US
 [2014/25]
Representative(s)Purdylucey Intellectual Property
6-7 Harcourt Terrace
D02 FH73 Dublin 2 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2014/25]Lucey, Michael
PurdyLucey
Intellectual Property
6-7 Harcourt Terrace
D2 Dublin / IE
Application number, filing date14151395.222.09.2010
[2014/25]
Priority number, dateUS20090244992P23.09.2009         Original published format: US 244992 P
US20100334834P14.05.2010         Original published format: US 334834 P
[2014/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2742858
Date:18.06.2014
Language:EN
[2014/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2742858
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/00, A61M25/00, A61F2/82, G06T7/00, // A61B19/00
[2014/25]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/25]
TitleGerman:Lumenmorphologie und vaskuläre Widerstandsmessungsdatensammelsysteme, Vorrichtung und Verfahren[2014/25]
English:Lumen morphology and vascular resistance measurements data collection systems, apparatus and methods[2014/25]
French:Systèmes de collecte de données de morphologie du lumen et de mesure de la résistance vasculaire[2014/26]
Examination procedure24.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/15]
20.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
30.04.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.06.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10763913.0  / EP2480124
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100763913) is  31.03.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.03.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
28.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 06
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 07
27.09.2017Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2018Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search   [ ] - No Search