Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757176

EP2757176 - MULTILAYER COATING WITH HIGH ABSORPTION OF SOLAR ENERGY AND WITH LOW THERMAL EMISSIVITY, RELATED CERMET COMPOSITE, A USE THEREOF AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/30]Multilayer coating with high absorption of solar energy and with low thermal emissivity, related cermet composite, a use thereof and processes for producing them
[2018/22]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  31.08.2018
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.05.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL, PT
published on 26.06.2019  [2019/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Fondazione Bruno Kessler
Via S. Croce 77
38122 Trento / IT
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / BENSAADA, LAIDANI, Nadhira
Via della Croce, 2
38123 TRENTO / IT
02 / BARTALI, Ruben
Via Pomeranos, 62
38123 TRENTO / IT
03 / MICHELI, Victor
Via Damiano Chiesa, 23
38017 MEZZOLOMBARDO (TN) / IT
04 / GOTTARDI, Gloria
Via Damiano Chiesa, 23
38017 MEZZOLOMBARDO (TN) / IT
05 / CREMA, Luigi
Viale Stazione, 19
38056 LEVICO TERME (TN) / IT
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Bonini, Ercole , et al
Studio Bonini Srl
Corso Fogazzaro, 8
36100 Vicenza / IT
[2018/40]
Former [2014/30]Bonini, Ercole , et al
Studio Bonini Srl Corso Fogazzaro, 8
36100 Vicenza / IT
Application number, filing date14151482.816.01.2014
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateIT2013VI0000616.01.2013         Original published format: IT VI20130006
[2014/30]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757176
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757176
Date:03.10.2018
Language:EN
[2018/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:C23C28/00, F24S70/30, C23C14/06, C23C14/58, C23C14/02
[2018/18]
Former International [2014/30]C23C28/00, F24J2/46, C23C14/06, C23C14/58, C23C14/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/40]
Former [2014/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEHRLAGIGE BESCHICHTUNG MIT HOHER ABSORPTION VON SONNENENERGIE UND NIEDRIGER THERMISCHER ABSTRAHLUNG, ZUGEHÖRIGER METALL-KERAMIK-VERBUNDWERKSTOFF, DEREN VERWENDUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG[2018/22]
English:MULTILAYER COATING WITH HIGH ABSORPTION OF SOLAR ENERGY AND WITH LOW THERMAL EMISSIVITY, RELATED CERMET COMPOSITE, A USE THEREOF AND PROCESSES FOR PRODUCING THEM[2018/22]
French:REVÊTEMENT MULTICOUCHE À HAUTE ABSORPTION DE L'ÉNERGIE SOLAIRE ET FAIBLE ÉMISSIVITÉ THERMIQUE, COMPOSITE CERMET ASSOCIÉ, LEUR UTILISATION ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LEUR FABRICATION[2018/22]
Former [2014/30]Mehrlagige Beschichtung mit hoher Absorption von Sonnenenergie und niedriger thermischer Abstrahlung, zugehöriger Metall-Keramik-Verbundwerkstoff, deren Verwendung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung
Former [2014/30]Multilayer coating with high absorption of solar energy and with low thermal emissivity, related cermet composite, a use thereof and processes for producing them
Former [2014/30]Revêtement multicouche à haute absorption de l'énergie solaire et faible émissivité thermique, composite cermet associé, leur utilisation et procédés pour leur fabrication
Examination procedure22.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/10]
15.11.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.03.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.08.2018Fee for grant paid
23.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
23.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.11.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
16.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL03.10.2018
AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
PT03.02.2019
[2019/26]
Former [2019/25]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
RS03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/24]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
SE03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
GR04.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/23]AT03.10.2018
CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
HR03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
LV03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/22]CZ03.10.2018
FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
PL03.10.2018
BG03.01.2019
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/21]FI03.10.2018
LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
IS03.02.2019
Former [2019/20]LT03.10.2018
NL03.10.2018
NO03.01.2019
Former [2019/17]NL03.10.2018
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5523132  (ZHANG QI-CHU [AU], et al) [Y] 1-7,11 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 15; figure 2 *;
 [IY]US2010092747  (CHUNG YIP-WAH [US], et al) [I] 8-10,12 * page 3, paragraphs 27-29; figure 3 * * page 4, paragraphs 36-38 * [Y] 1-7,11;
 [Y]WO2012065648  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-7,11 * page 7, lines 12-23 * * page 8, lines 5-23 * * page 9, line 33 - page 11, line 21; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2010294263  (KUCKELKORN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,11 * page 4, paragraphs 48,54,57; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2011088687  (KUCKELKORN THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-7,11 * page 2, paragraphs 25-28; figure 2 * * page 3, paragraphs 43,54 *;
 [Y]WO2009107157  (ENEA ENTE NUOVE TEC [IT], et al) [Y] 1-7,11 * page 7, line 23 - page 9, line 10 *
by applicantUS5523132
 US2010092747