Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756865

EP2756865 - Device and method for fusion beat detection [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Database last updated on 15.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019 [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BIOTRONIK SE & Co. KG
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Lian, Jie
9150 SW Ivory St.
Beaverton, Oregon 97007 / US
02 / Müssig, Dirk
3053 Roxbury Dr.
West Linn, Oregon 97068 / US
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Galander, Marcus , et al
Biotronik Corporate Services SE
Corporate Intellectual Property
Sieversufer 7 - 9
12359 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2016/27]Galander, Marcus , et al
Biotronik SE & Co. KG
Corporate Intellectual Properties
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Former [2014/30]Lamprecht, Frank
Biotronik SE & Co. KG
Corporate Intellectual Properties
Woermannkehre 1
12359 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date14151738.320.01.2014
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateUS201361754982P22.01.2013         Original published format: US 201361754982 P
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2756865
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2756865
Date:06.07.2016
Language:EN
[2016/27]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61N1/37
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/27]
Former [2014/30]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fusionsschlagdetektion[2014/30]
English:Device and method for fusion beat detection[2014/30]
French:Dispositif et procédé de détection de battement de fusion[2014/30]
Examination procedure28.11.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.11.2014Examination requested  [2015/02]
02.06.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.10.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2016Fee for grant paid
30.05.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.06.2015
Opposition(s)07.04.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.01.2014
AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/46]AL06.07.2016
AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
Former [2018/43]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU20.01.2017
MT20.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
Former [2018/02]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
LU20.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
Former [2017/50]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
FR31.01.2017
Former [2017/45]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
MC06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SI06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/31]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
CZ06.07.2016
DK06.07.2016
EE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RO06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
SK06.07.2016
SM06.07.2016
BG06.10.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/13]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
LV06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/11]AT06.07.2016
BE06.07.2016
ES06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
GR07.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
PT07.11.2016
Former [2017/10]BE06.07.2016
FI06.07.2016
HR06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
PL06.07.2016
RS06.07.2016
SE06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
IS06.11.2016
Former [2017/09]FI06.07.2016
IT06.07.2016
LT06.07.2016
NL06.07.2016
NO06.10.2016
Former [2017/07]LT06.07.2016
Documents cited:Search[Y]US7647104  (SNELL JAY [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * column 1, line 64 - column 2, line 5 * * column 5, line 34 - column 10, line 28 *;
 [Y]EP1291038  (PACESETTER INC [US]) [Y] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US2006247693  (DONG YANTING [US], et al) [Y] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] - [0044] - [0047] *;
 [AD]US7899520  (LIAN JIE [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US7328066  (LEVINE PAUL A [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US6950704  (BRADLEY KERRY [US]) [AD] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2004127949  (KIM JAEHO [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO0117608  (ST JUDE MEDICAL [SE], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *
by applicantUS6950704
 US7006869
 US6904321
 US7765004
 US7979113
 US6928326
 US7899520
 US8082028
 US8090434