Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2756822

EP2756822 - Instrumentation for positioning and securing a graft [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  20.04.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.12.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Howmedica Osteonics Corp.
325 Corporate Drive
Mahwah, NJ 07430 / US
[2014/30]
Inventor(s)01 / Steiner, Mark
7 Hewins Farm Road
Wellesley, MA 02481-6838 / US
02 / Robison, Cortny
1192 Windsor Street
Salt Lake City, UT 84105 / US
03 / Rudert, Lindsey
2905 Inca St Unit 1001
Denver, CO 80202 / US
04 / Miller, Daniel
43 S Ogden
Denver, CO 80209 / US
 [2017/41]
Former [2014/30]01 / Steiner, Mark
7 Hewins Farm Road
Wellesley, Massachusetts 02481-6838 / US
02 / Robison, Cortny
1192 Windsor Street
Salt Lake City, Utah 84105 / US
03 / Rudert, Lindsey
2905 Inca St Unit 1001
Denver, Colorado 80202 / US
04 / Miller, Daniel
43 S Ogden
Denver, Colorado 80209 / US
Representative(s)Gill Jennings & Every LLP
The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[2017/41]
Former [2014/30]Jappy, John William Graham
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date14151822.520.01.2014
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateUS20131374609621.01.2013         Original published format: US201313746096
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2756822
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2756822
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2756822
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.2014
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/08, A61B17/17
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/30]
TitleGerman:Instrumente zur Positionierung und Befestigung eines Implantates[2014/30]
English:Instrumentation for positioning and securing a graft[2014/30]
French:Instrumentation de positionnement et de sécurisation d'un greffon[2014/30]
Examination procedure18.03.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
18.03.2015Examination requested  [2015/18]
03.08.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.12.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.2017Fee for grant paid
01.09.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.09.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.08.2016
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IE20.01.2018
LU20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2019/09]
Former [2018/52]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
LU20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/50]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
LU20.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/47]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
LU20.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/40]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/37]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
SM11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
HR11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
RS11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
NO11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
NL11.10.2017
NO11.01.2018
Former [2018/17]NL11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]WO03086221  (STEENLAGE ERIC S [US]) [X] 1-11 * figures 12-16 *;
 [X]WO0024327  (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-11 * figure 34 *;
 [X]US5658289  (BOUCHER JAMES A [US], et al) [X] 1 * figure 4 *;
 [X]DE8903079U  (WEBA MEDIZIONTECHNIK) [X] 1 * figure 3 *
by applicantUS20100859580
 US20090460310
 US20080682324