Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2762547

EP2762547 - Luminescent particles of carbon, method for preparing same and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.04.2016
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.10.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AL
published on 14.11.2018  [2018/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT À L'ÉNERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ÉNERGIES ALTERNATIVES
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D"
25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2014/32]For all designated states
COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE ET AUX ENERGIES ALTERNATIVES
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / AUGER, Aurélien
22 rue Gouin
72000 LE MANS / FR
02 / CAPRON, Philippe
106 rue du Vallon de Lamartine
38730 VIRIEU SUR BOURBRE / FR
03 / CHARVET, Nicolas
129, chemin des Termes
38340 VOREPPE / FR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Cabinet Laurent & Charras
Le Contemporain
50 Chemin de la Bruyère
69574 Dardilly Cedex / FR
[2014/32]
Application number, filing date14151833.220.01.2014
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateFR2013005083931.01.2013         Original published format: FR 1350839
[2014/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2762547
Date:06.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2762547
Date:27.05.2015
Language:FR
[2015/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:C09K11/65, C09D11/00
[2014/32]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/22]
Former [2014/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Kohlenstoff-Leuchtstoffpartikeln, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Verwendung[2014/32]
English:Luminescent particles of carbon, method for preparing same and use thereof[2014/32]
French:Particules luminescentes de carbone, procédé de préparation et utilisation[2014/32]
Examination procedure22.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/10]
20.03.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.04.2015Fee for grant paid
20.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.03.2015
Opposition(s)01.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.01.2014
AL27.05.2015
AT27.05.2015
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
NL27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE20.01.2016
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
[2018/46]
Former [2018/29]HU20.01.2014
AT27.05.2015
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
NL27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
TR27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE20.01.2016
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2018/28]HU20.01.2014
AT27.05.2015
CY27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MK27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
NL27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
SM27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE20.01.2016
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2017/40]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
MT27.05.2015
NL27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SE27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE20.01.2016
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2017/07]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
IE20.01.2016
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/42]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
MC27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/39]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
LU20.01.2016
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/24]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SI27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
BE31.01.2016
Former [2016/10]AT27.05.2015
CZ27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
PL27.05.2015
RO27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
SK27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/09]AT27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
EE27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2016/07]AT27.05.2015
DK27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2015/51]AT27.05.2015
ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2015/50]ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
BG27.08.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
IS27.09.2015
PT28.09.2015
Former [2015/49]ES27.05.2015
FI27.05.2015
HR27.05.2015
LT27.05.2015
LV27.05.2015
RS27.05.2015
NO27.08.2015
GR28.08.2015
PT28.09.2015
Documents cited:Search[A]WO2007050984  (UNIV CLEMSON [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2010181534  (SHENDEROVA OLGA [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2010008519  (METTERS ANDREW [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2012158478  (SAUDI ARABIAN OIL CO [SA], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2006112858  (NGUYEN KHE C [VN]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *