Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784901

EP2784901 - Universal serial bus chargers and charging managment methods [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2019New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Acer Incorporated
8F, No. 88, Sec. 1, Hsin Tai Wu Road
Hsichih
Taipei County 221 / TW
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Tsai, Meng-Chieh
8F, No. 88, Sec. 1
Hsin Tai Wu Rd.
Hsichih
221 New Taipei City / TW
02 / Lin, Che-Wei
8F, No. 88, Sec. 1
Hsin Tai Wu Rd.
Hsichih
221 New Taipei City / TW
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Becker Kurig Straus
Patentanwälte
Bavariastrasse 7
80336 München / DE
[2014/40]
Application number, filing date14152047.822.01.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateTW2013011136729.03.2013         Original published format: TW 102111367
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784901
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784901
Date:22.04.2015
Language:EN
[2015/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.03.2015
ClassificationInternational:H02J7/00, G06F1/26
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:USB-Ladegeräte und Ladeverwaltungsverfahren[2014/40]
English:Universal serial bus chargers and charging managment methods[2014/40]
French:Chargeurs de bus de série universel et procédés de gestion de charge[2014/40]
Examination procedure07.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
07.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/33]
21.05.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2019Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.05.2019
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2008313477  (NUMANO FUJIHITO [JP]) [X] 1,2,4,8,9 * paragraphs [0087] - [0092] - [ 124] - [0136]; figures 2,4,5 * [I] 3,5-7,10;
 [I]US2007103115  (LIU SHENG-HUI [TW]) [I] 1,8 * paragraphs [0016] - [0022]; figures 2,3 *;
 [A]US2011016341  (TOM STEVEN R [US] ET AL) [A] 1,8 * paragraphs [0013] - [0016]; figure 1 *