Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2899043

EP2899043 - Piston accumulator, vehicle axle and vehicle suspension system with such a piston accumulator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  06.08.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): FR, GB, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hemscheidt Fahrwerktechnik GmbH & Co. KG
Leichtmetallstrasse 7
42781 Haan-Gruiten / DE
[2015/31]
Inventor(s)01 / Wöhrmann, Mark, Dr.-Ing.
Comeniusweg 13
40723 Hilden / DE
02 / Naploszek, Hartwig
Am Stern 32
45289 Essen / DE
 [2015/38]
Former [2015/31]01 / Wöhrmann, Mark, Dr.-Ing.
Comeniusweg 13
40723 Hilden / DE
02 / Naploszeh, Hartwij
Am Stern 32
45289 Essen / DE
Representative(s)Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr. Solf & Zapf
Candidplatz 15
81543 München / DE
[2018/02]
Former [2015/31]Solf, Alexander
Patent- und Rechtanwälte
Dr. Solf & Zapf
Schlossbleiche 20
42103 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date14152197.122.01.2014
[2015/31]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2899043
Date:29.07.2015
Language:DE
[2015/31]
Type: A9 Corrected patent application 
No.:EP2899043
Date:16.09.2015
[2015/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2899043
Date:10.01.2018
Language:DE
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:B60G11/30, B60G9/00
[2015/31]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/31]
TitleGerman:Kolbenspeicher, Fahrzeugachse und Fahrzeug-Federungssystem mit einem derartigen Kolbenspeicher[2015/31]
English:Piston accumulator, vehicle axle and vehicle suspension system with such a piston accumulator[2015/31]
French:Accumulateur à piston, essieu de véhicule et système de suspension de véhicule doté d'un tel accumulateur à piston[2015/31]
Examination procedure12.01.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.01.2016Examination requested  [2016/08]
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.08.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.11.2017Fee for grant paid
24.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
24.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2016
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE22.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
FR12.03.2018
BG10.04.2018
GB10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE22.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
LU22.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/43]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2003132626  (CARLSTEDT ROBERT P [US] ET AL) [X] 1,4-6,8,10,13,14 * paragraph [0034]; figure 7 * [I] 2,3,7,9;
 [XI]DE102012203829  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * paragraphs [0022] , [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] * [I] 2,3;
 [A]DE1087466  (BETEILIGUNGS & PATENTVERW GMBH) [A] 1,5,7 * column 5, line 69 - column 6, line 6; figure 2 * * column 1, line 1 - line 5 *;
 [A]EP1500531  (KNORR BREMSE SYSTEME [DE]; DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE] KNORR BREMSE SYSTE) [A] 1,4,13 * paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US2004251653  (MOMIYAMA FUJIO [JP]) [A] 1,4-9,13 * paragraph [0022]; figure 4 *
by applicantDE202009018583U