Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2784417


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
16.11.2019 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
08.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
08.11.2019 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
25.10.2019 Change - divisional application(s) published on  27.11.2019 [2019/48]
03.07.2019 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.06.2019 Change - German title published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019 Change - English title published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
21.06.2019 Change - French title published on  24.07.2019  [2019/30]
26.01.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.07.2018 New entry: Reply to examination report
07.03.2018 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
23.02.2018 First examination report
30.01.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
27.01.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
04.03.2016 Amendment by applicant
04.03.2016 Change - designated states published on  06.04.2016  [2016/14]
02.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
31.07.2015 Publication of search report published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
31.07.2015 Change - classification published on  02.09.2015  [2015/36]
06.03.2015 Change - classification published on  08.04.2015  [2015/15]
01.10.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]
29.08.2014 Request for examination filed published on  01.10.2014  [2014/40]