Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2784417 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410046081 EP14152472



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9395115Global Dossier 19.07.2016B2
US2015377543 31.12.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201514848930 09.09.2015
US201414162921 24.01.2014
KR20130100202 23.08.2013
KR20130031379 25.03.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20150022404Global Dossier 04.03.2015A
Priority number Date
KR20130100202 23.08.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20140116620Global Dossier 06.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130031379 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US9476634Global Dossier 25.10.2016B2
US2014285082 25.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130100202 23.08.2013
KR20130031379 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104075534BGlobal Dossier 01.03.2017B
CN104075534 01.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130100202 23.08.2013
KR20130031379 25.03.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2784417Global Dossier 02.09.2015A3
EP2784417 01.10.2014A2
Priority number Date
KR20130100202 23.08.2013
KR20130031379 25.03.2013
TypeType Divisional application