Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784417

EP2784417 - Refrigerator sub door opening limiter [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/40]Refrigerator
[2019/30]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019New entry: Payment of fee for grant 
08.11.2019New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics Inc.
LG Twin Towers
20, Yeouido-dong
Youngdungpo-gu
150-721 Seoul / KR
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Choi, Sungwoo
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
02 / Lee, Jaeyoul
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
03 / Kim, Junghun
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
04 / Kim, Seonkyu
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
05 / Choi, Hyun
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
06 / Kwon, Ohseob
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
07 / Cho, Kyeongchul
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
08 / Yoon, Seungjin
Seocho R&D Campus, LG Electronics Inc. 19
Yangjaedae-ro 11-gil, Seocho-gu
137-130 Seoul / KR
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date14152472.824.01.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2013003137925.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130031379
KR2013010020223.08.2013         Original published format: KR 20130100202
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2784417
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2784417
Date:02.09.2015
Language:EN
[2015/36]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.07.2015
ClassificationInternational:F25D23/02
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/14]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Begrenzer zum Öffnen einer Kühlschranktür[2019/30]
English:Refrigerator sub door opening limiter[2019/30]
French:Limiteur d'ouverture de porte de réfrigérateur[2019/30]
Former [2014/40]Kühlschrank
Former [2014/40]Refrigerator
Former [2014/40]Réfrigérateur
Examination procedure20.02.2014Examination requested  [2014/40]
23.02.2016Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.07.2019Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2019Fee for grant paid
06.11.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP19205059.9
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.02.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
20.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
26.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
22.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008289355  (KANG BYEONG-GYU [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * figures 1-23 *;
 [XI]US2009008403  (LEE NAM GI [KR], et al) [X] 1 * figures 1-10 * [I] 2-10;
 [X]KR100760403B  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 1-3 *;
 [XI]KR20060118897  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 3,4 * [I] 2-10;
 [X]KR20090105251  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * figures 1-5 *;
 [X]US2010154457  (KIM DONG-JEONG [KR], et al) [X] 11-15 * figures 1-13 *;
 [X]DE102011003440  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 11-15 * figures 1-7 *