Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2757766

EP2757766 - Processing method for bearer control [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  02.02.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[2018/10]
Former [2014/30]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian, Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / Zhu, Dongming
c/o Huawei Administration Building, Bantian
Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
02 / Xu, Peili
c/o Huawei Administration Building, Bantian
Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
03 / Lin, Ming
c/o Huawei Administration Building, Bantian
Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
04 / Duan, Xiaoqin
c/o Huawei Administration Building, Bantian
Longgang District
518129 Shenzhen / CN
 [2014/30]
Representative(s)Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 11a
80339 München / DE
[2018/10]
Former [2014/30]Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Theresienhöhe 13
80339 München / DE
Application number, filing date14152603.827.07.2006
[2014/30]
Priority number, dateCN2005109390931.08.2005         Original published format: CN200510093909
[2014/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2757766
Date:23.07.2014
Language:EN
[2014/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2757766
Date:07.03.2018
Language:EN
[2018/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04M7/00, H04L29/06, H04M7/12
[2014/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2018/10]
Former [2014/30]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:Verarbeitungsverfahren zur Trägersteuerung[2014/30]
English:Processing method for bearer control[2014/30]
French:Procédé de traitement pour commande de support[2014/30]
Examination procedure23.01.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.01.2015Examination requested  [2015/10]
20.09.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.12.2017Fee for grant paid
28.12.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP06761588.0  / EP1942648
Divisional application(s)EP18152402.6  / EP3361714
Opposition(s)10.12.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2019/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 03
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 04
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 05
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 06
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 07
27.01.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
29.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
29.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU27.07.2018
BE31.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
[2019/24]
Former [2019/21]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU27.07.2018
CH31.07.2018
LI31.07.2018
Former [2019/17]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
LU27.07.2018
Former [2019/15]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
MC07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/13]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SI07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/08]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
DK07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2019/03]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
PT09.07.2018
Former [2018/50]AT07.03.2018
CY07.03.2018
CZ07.03.2018
EE07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
PL07.03.2018
RO07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
SK07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/47]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
IT07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/45]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
NL07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/40]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
BG07.06.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/39]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
LV07.03.2018
SE07.03.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/37]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
GR08.06.2018
Former [2018/36]CY07.03.2018
ES07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Former [2018/35]CY07.03.2018
FI07.03.2018
LT07.03.2018
Documents cited:Search[A]US2005083912  (AFSHAR SIROOS K [US], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] *;
 [A]  - ANDREASEN B FOSTER CISCO SYSTEMS F, "Media Gateway Control Protocol (MGCP) Version 1.0; rfc3435.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20030101), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015009218 [A] 1-21 * page 48, line 1 - page 54, line 17 * * page 75, line 1 - page 76, line l * * page 87, paragraph 3.2.2.3 * * page 110, paragraph 3.4.2 - page 111 *