Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2772655

EP2772655 - Rolling element accommodating tool [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.08.2017
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nippon Bearing Co., Ltd.
2833 Oaza-Chiya-Ko Ojiya-shi
Niigata / JP
[2014/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Yamazaki, Toru
c/o NIPPON BEARING CO., LTD.
2833, Oaza-Chiya-Ko
Ojiya-shi
Niigata / JP
02 / Ueki, Yusuke
c/o NIPPON BEARING CO., LTD.
2833, Oaza-Chiya-Ko
Ojiya-shi
Niigata / JP
 [2014/36]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/42]
Former [2014/36]HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date14152629.327.01.2014
[2014/36]
Priority number, dateJP2013003990428.02.2013         Original published format: JP 2013039904
[2014/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2772655
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2772655
Date:19.10.2016
Language:EN
[2016/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2014
ClassificationInternational:F16C29/06, F16C33/46, F16C33/50, F16C33/38, B29C70/00, F16C17/04, F16C33/12
[2014/36]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/42]
Former [2014/36]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Wälzkörperaufnahmewerkzeug[2014/36]
English:Rolling element accommodating tool[2014/36]
French:Outil d'adaptation d'élément de roulement[2014/36]
Examination procedure23.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2014Examination requested  [2015/05]
10.03.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.07.2016Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
12.07.2016Fee for grant paid
12.07.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
05.09.2016Information about intention to grant a patent
05.09.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  10.03.2016
Opposition(s)20.07.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IE27.01.2017
LU27.01.2017
MT27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
[2018/43]
Former [2018/13]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IE27.01.2017
LU27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/51]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
LU27.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SI19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
CH31.01.2017
FR31.01.2017
LI31.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/42]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
MC19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/38]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
BG19.01.2017
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/37]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
IT19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
SM19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/36]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
EE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RO19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
SK19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/34]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
CZ19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/33]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
DK19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/26]AT19.10.2016
BE19.10.2016
ES19.10.2016
FI19.10.2016
HR19.10.2016
LT19.10.2016
LV19.10.2016
NL19.10.2016
PL19.10.2016
RS19.10.2016
SE19.10.2016
NO19.01.2017
GR20.01.2017
IS19.02.2017
PT20.02.2017
Former [2017/12]LV19.10.2016
Documents cited:Search[A]EP1498246  (KUREHA GOSEN CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS6290226  (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1-12 * abstract *;
 [A]FR1601444  (M. VILLAMOYOR M JACQUES, M SINDZINGRE) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1059698  (SCHAEFFLER WILHELM, et al) [A] 1-12 * page 2, lines 11-25; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]DD91164  (C SCHNABEL) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP2476925  (GROZ BECKERT KG [DE]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantJP2001074048