Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784561

EP2784561 - Automatic focusing method and apparatus for same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.04.2018
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kozinski, Dawid
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
Samsung Electronics Polska Sp. z.o.o.
UI. Marynarska 15
02-674 Warsaw / PL
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14152810.928.01.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateKR2013003484229.03.2013         Original published format: KR 20130034842
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784561
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2014
ClassificationInternational:G02B7/28, // H04N13/04, H04N5/232
[2014/40]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/40]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Automatisches Fokussierungsverfahren und Vorrichtung dafür[2014/40]
English:Automatic focusing method and apparatus for same[2014/40]
French:Procédé de focalisation automatique et appareil correspondant[2014/40]
Examination procedure01.04.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.04.2015Examination requested  [2015/20]
09.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.08.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  09.04.2018
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
23.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6097892  (SAITO HIROSHI [JP]) [X] 1,4-7,10,13-15 * column 1, line 7 - line 16 * * column 3, line 29 - line 42 * [Y] 2,3,8,9,11,12;
 [Y]EP1637975  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2,8,11 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2009285322  (NIDEK KK) [Y] 3,9,12 * abstract * * the whole document *;
 [A]JP2001290101  (HATTORI TOMOHIKO, et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09197495  (NIKON CORP) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH10221591  (CANON KK) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
by applicantUS5139022