Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2871839

EP2871839 - Image transmission apparatus in digital TV broadcasting with inserted additional data [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  10.05.2019
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  04.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip10.05.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 12.06.2019  [2019/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kangwon National University Industry Cooperation Foundation
1 Gangwondaehak-gil
Chuncheon-si, Gangwon-do 220-701 / KR
[2015/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Han, Chan-Ho
109-502, SaetbyeolMaeul Life Apt
Bundang-dong
Bundang-gu
Seongnam-si
101-110 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/20]
Representative(s)Kuhnen & Wacker Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsbüro PartG mbB
Prinz-Ludwig-Straße 40A
85354 Freising / DE
[N/P]
Former [2015/20]Jenkins, Richard Gavin
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date14153121.029.01.2014
[2015/20]
Priority number, dateKR2013013530008.11.2013         Original published format: KR 20130135300
[2015/20]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2871839
Date:13.05.2015
Language:EN
[2015/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/025, H04N7/08, H04N19/00
[2015/20]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/20]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Bildübertragungsvorrichtung bei der Rundfunkübertragung von Digitalfernsehen[2015/20]
English:Image transmission apparatus in digital TV broadcasting with inserted additional data[2015/20]
French:Appareil de transmission d'images de diffusion de télévision numérique[2015/20]
Examination procedure29.01.2014Examination requested  [2015/20]
13.11.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.10.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.05.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.01.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/24]
08.01.2019Date of oral proceedings
22.01.2019Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/24]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.10.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
09.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
12.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
10.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP2107806  (HARMAN BECKER AUTOMOTIVE SYS [DE]) [X] 1,9-11 * paragraphs [0008] - [0018] - [0029] - [0038] - [0050] - [0058] - [0079] , [0080] , [0083] - [0085] - [0113] * [I] 2,4-6;
 [I]US2009252231  (TAHARA KATSUMI [JP] ET AL) [I] 1,4,6,9-11 * paragraph [0083]; figure 8 *;
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "A/63, Standard For Coding 25/50 Hz Video", NOT KNOWN,, (19970502), XP030001578 [A] 1-11 * paragraph [5.1.2] *
by applicantKR20130098027