Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2804087

EP2804087 - Terminal and method for editing text using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  20.10.2017
Database last updated on 16.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
17113, 1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
[2015/40]
Former [2014/47]For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
95, Samsung 2 Ro
Giheung-Gu
Yongin-City
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Chae, Kyung Chan
Samsung Display Institute
Nongseo-dong
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/47]
Representative(s)Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
15 Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1BW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/47]Mounteney, Simon James
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
Application number, filing date14153136.829.01.2014
[2014/47]
Priority number, dateKR2013005447114.05.2013         Original published format: KR 20130054471
[2014/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2804087
Date:19.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2804087
Date:25.02.2015
Language:EN
[2015/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.01.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0488, G06F3/023, G06F17/24
[2015/09]
Former International [2014/47]G06F3/0488, G06F3/023
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2014/47]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Endgerät und Verfahren zur Bearbeitung von Text damit[2014/47]
English:Terminal and method for editing text using the same[2014/47]
French:Terminal et procédé d'édition de texte à l'aide de celui-ci[2014/47]
Examination procedure31.03.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
10.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.10.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.02.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.10.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  20.10.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009161958  (MARKIEWICZ JAN-KRISTIAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-7,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0033] - [0043]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0067]; figure 5A * * paragraphs [0073] - [0083]; figures 8-14 * [I] 8,9,14;
 [XI]US2011035209  (MACFARLANE SCOTT [US]) [X] 1-7,10-13,15 * paragraphs [0014] - [0057]; figures 1-3 * [I] 8,9,14;
 [I]US2013019169  (BASTIDE PAUL R [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0041]; figures 1-4 *;
 [A]US2007109281  (SIMMONS ALEX J [US] ET AL) [A] 8,9,14 * paragraphs [0041] - [0043]; figures 10-12 *