Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2830321

EP2830321 - Display apparatus and method for providing personalized service thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  17.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.05.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2019Refusal of applicationpublished on 19.06.2019  [2019/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Kim, Hyun-woo
113-301, 498, Yeongtong-ro, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2015/05]
Representative(s)Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2015/05]Walaski, Jan Filip
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London
EC1A 4HD / GB
Application number, filing date14153171.530.01.2014
[2015/05]
Priority number, dateKR2013008800425.07.2013         Original published format: KR 20130088004
[2015/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2830321
Date:28.01.2015
Language:EN
[2015/05]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.08.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04N21/422, G10L17/00, H04N21/442
[2015/05]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/36]
Former [2015/05]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtung und Verfahren zur Bereitstellung personalisierter Dienste dafür[2015/05]
English:Display apparatus and method for providing personalized service thereof[2015/05]
French:Appareil d'affichage et procédé pour fournir un service personnalisé de celui-ci[2015/05]
Examination procedure28.07.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.07.2015Examination requested  [2015/36]
15.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.01.2019Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 07.02.2019
31.01.2019Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/25]
07.02.2019Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.02.2019Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/25]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2017
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
19.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
19.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.201906   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]US2009217324  (MASSIMI MICHAEL L [US]) [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0026] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 6,7,14,15;
 [XY]EP1513136  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,4,5,9,12,13 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0056] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 6,7,14,15;
 [XY]US7136817  (SCHRODER ERNST F [DE] ET AL SCHROEDER ERNST F [DE] ET AL) [X] 1-3,9-11 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 2, line 55 * * column 2, line 3 - line 55 * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 67 * * figures 1,2 * [Y] 6,7,14,15;
 [Y]US2010107184  (SHINTANI PETER RAE [US]) [Y] 6,7,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] * * figures 1-7 *;
 [A]US2006028337  (LI QI P [US]) [A] 1-5,8-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0013] * * figures 1,2 *;
 [A]US2012135684  (SHRUM JR EDGAR V [US] ET AL) [A] 1-5,8-13 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0101] * * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]US2009138805  (HILDRETH EVAN [CA]) [A] 6,7,14,15 * abstract * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0047] * * paragraph [0133] * * figures 1,7,14 *