Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2763469

EP2763469 - METHOD FOR MODIFYING THE STATUS OF LOCAL ACCESS POINTS IN A CELLULAR NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2014/32]Method for modifying the status of local access points in a cellular network
[2017/08]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  04.05.2018
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  26.05.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  16.01.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip21.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MC
published on 24.07.2019  [2019/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives
Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
[2014/32]
Inventor(s)01 / Calvanese Strinati, Emilio
1, rue Amedée Morel
38000 Grenoble / FR
02 / De Domenico, Antonio
16, rue Hoche
38000 Grenoble / FR
03 / Oueis, Jessica
40, avenue Albert Premier de Belgique
38000 Grenoble / FR
 [2014/32]
Representative(s)Ilgart, Jean-Christophe , et al
BREVALEX
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
[2014/32]
Application number, filing date14153291.130.01.2014
[2014/32]
Priority number, dateFR2013005094704.02.2013         Original published format: FR 1350947
[2014/32]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2763469
Date:06.08.2014
Language:FR
[2014/32]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2763469
Date:28.06.2017
Language:FR
[2017/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.03.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W52/02, H04W72/04
[2017/07]
Former International [2014/32]H04W52/02
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2017/26]
Former [2014/32]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ZUSTANDSVERÄNDERUNGSVERFAHREN DER LOKALEN ZUGANGSPUNKTE IN EIN MOBILFUNKNETZ[2017/08]
English:METHOD FOR MODIFYING THE STATUS OF LOCAL ACCESS POINTS IN A CELLULAR NETWORK[2017/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE MODIFICATION DE L'ÉTAT DE POINTS D'ACCÈS LOCAUX DANS UN RÉSEAU CELLULAIRE[2017/08]
Former [2014/32]Zustandsveränderungsverfahren der lokalen Zugangspunkte in ein Mobilfunknetz
Former [2014/32]Method for modifying the status of local access points in a cellular network
Former [2014/32]Procédé de modification de l'état de points d'accès locaux dans un réseau cellulaire
Examination procedure31.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/50]
24.01.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.05.2017Fee for grant paid
15.05.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
15.05.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.01.2017
Opposition(s)29.03.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
30.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MC28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
[2019/30]
Former [2019/09]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
IE30.01.2018
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
CH31.01.2018
LI31.01.2018
Former [2018/50]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
BE31.01.2018
Former [2018/47]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
LU30.01.2018
Former [2018/43]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
MT28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/39]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SI28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/21]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
DK28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/11]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
ES28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
IT28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
PL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
SM28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
IS28.10.2017
Former [2018/10]AT28.06.2017
CZ28.06.2017
EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RO28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
SK28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2018/09]EE28.06.2017
FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/52]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
NL28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/50]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
LV28.06.2017
RS28.06.2017
SE28.06.2017
BG28.09.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Former [2017/49]FI28.06.2017
HR28.06.2017
LT28.06.2017
NO28.09.2017
GR29.09.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]FR2964290  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]) [X] 1-10 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 26 * * page 7, line 18 - page 9, line 25 * * claims 1-10 *;
 [A]US2009252172  (HARE ROBERT LAWRENCE [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * * claims 1-27 *
 [X]  - POLLIN S ET AL, "MEERA: Cross-Layer Methodology for Energy Efficient Resource Allocation in Wireless Networks", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080101), vol. 7, no. 1, doi:10.1109/TWC.2008.05356, ISSN 1536-1276, pages 98 - 109, XP011381101 [X] 1-10 * page 98, paragraph I - page 99, paragraph B *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TWC.2008.05356
by applicant   - L. SAKER ET AL., "Optimal control of wake up mechanisms of femtocells in heterogeneous networks", IEEE JSAC, (201204), vol. 30, no. 3, doi:doi:10.1109/JSAC.2012.120415, pages 664 - 672, XP011437091

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSAC.2012.120415
    - DE DOMENICO, A.; CALVANESE STRINATI, E.; DI BENEDETTO, M.-G., "A Survey on MAC Strategies for Cognitive Radio Networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS SURVEYS & TUTORIALS, vol. 14, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1109/SURV.2011.111510.00108, pages 21 - 44, XP011420410

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/SURV.2011.111510.00108
    - BURGARD, W.; DERR, A.; FOX, D.; CREMERS, A.B., "Integrating global position estimation and position tracking for mobile robots: the dynamic Markov localization approach", INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, 1998. PROCEEDINGS., 1998 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, (19981013), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1109/IROS.1998.727279, pages 730 - 735, XP010311534

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IROS.1998.727279
    - T. CHEN; Y. YANG; H. ZHANG; H. KIM; K. HORNEMAN, "Network energy saving technologies for green wireless access networks", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (2011), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/MWC.2011.6056690, pages 30 - 38, XP011358420

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2011.6056690
    - "EARTH, Project Deliverable D4.3", FINAL REPORT ON GREEN RADIO TECHNOLOGIES, (2012), URL: https://www.ict-earth.eu/publications/deliverables/deliverables.html
    - D. NG; E. LO; R. SCHOBER, "Energy-Efficient Resource Allocation in OFDMA Systems with Large Numbers of Base Station Antennas", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (2012), pages 1 - 13
    - Z. NIU; Y. WU; J. GONG; Z. YANG, "Cell zooming for cost-efficient green cellular networks", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, (2010), vol. 48, no. 11, pages 74 - 79, XP011320500
    - Z. NIU; S. ZHOU; Y. HUA; Q. ZHANG; D. CAO, "Energy-Aware Network Planning for Wireless Cellular System with Inter-Cell Cooperation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (2012), vol. 11, no. 4, pages 1412 - 1423
    - A. CONTE; A. FEKI; L. CHIARAVIGLIO; D. CIULLO; M. MEO; M. MARSAN, "Cell wilting and blossoming for energy efficiency", IEEE WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS, (2011), vol. 18, no. 5, doi:doi:10.1109/MWC.2011.6056692, pages 50 - 57, XP011507934

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MWC.2011.6056692