Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2785034

EP2785034 - Relaying device, computer program for relaying device and method for controlling relaying device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  02.10.2015
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]For all designated states
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
15-1 Naeshiro-cho, Mizuho-ku
Nagoya, Aichi 467-8561 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ishibashi, Masayuki
c/o Intellectual Property Dept.,
Brother Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha
1-1-1, Kawaghishi
Mizuho-ku
Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)J A Kemp LLP
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Smith, Samuel Leonard
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Application number, filing date14153535.131.01.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007450629.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013074506
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2785034
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2785034
Date:25.03.2015
Language:EN
[2015/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.02.2015
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/12, H04N1/00, G06T1/00
[2015/13]
Former International [2014/40]H04N1/00, G06T1/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/45]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Weiterleitungsvorrichtung, Computerprogramm für Weiterleitungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung der Weiterleitungsvorrichtung[2014/40]
English:Relaying device, computer program for relaying device and method for controlling relaying device[2014/40]
French:Dispositif de relais, programme informatique pour dispositif de relais et procédé de commande du dispositif de relais[2014/40]
Examination procedure22.09.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.09.2015Examination requested  [2015/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.01.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
11.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
15.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[X]US2012033257  (OKAZAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0072] * * paragraph [0079] * * paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0078] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0006] * * figure 11 *;
 [A]WO2011105013  (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * figure 1 * * figure 5 * * figure 8 *;
 [A]US2011149333  (HONG JIANG [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraphs [0041] , [0046]; figures 1,4,5 *;
 [A]WO2011080994  (CANON KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0109]; figures 4,7,8,12 *;
 [A]EP2498177  (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraphs [0040] , [0046] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0068] * * paragraph [0074] - paragraph [0076]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2012036570  (WADA KATSUHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *;
 [A]US2011090535  (TOWATA HIROAKI [JP]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *
by applicantJP2008229993