Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2799989

EP2799989 - Apparatus and method of parallel processing execution [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 21.10.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Song, Joon Ho
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97
Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Kim, Do Hyung
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97
Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Lee, Shi Hwa
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology 97
Samsung 2-ro, Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
446-712 Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2014/45]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/45]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date14153640.903.02.2014
[2014/45]
Priority number, dateKR2013003974011.04.2013         Original published format: KR 20130039740
[2014/45]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2799989
Date:05.11.2014
Language:EN
[2014/45]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2799989
Date:24.12.2014
Language:EN
[2014/52]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F9/50
[2014/45]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/32]
Former [2014/45]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Parallelverarbeitungsdurchführung[2014/45]
English:Apparatus and method of parallel processing execution[2014/45]
French:Appareil et procédé d'exécution de traitement parallèle[2014/45]
Examination procedure24.06.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2015Examination requested  [2015/32]
23.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.04.2017Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2017/36]
04.05.2017Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2017/36]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.11.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.201704   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XI]US5758176  (AGARWAL RAMESH CHANDRA [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,9-13 * column 1, line 46 - line 55 * * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 8 * * column 4, line 56 - line 61 * * column 5, line 29 - line 43 * * column 6, line 28 - line 42 * * column 7, line 21 - line 44 * * column 8, line 12 - line 59 * * figure 6 * [I] 7,8,14,15;
 [I]US5987178  (ANESKO ALEXANDER [US] ET AL) [I] 1-15 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 12 * * column 6, line 38 - line 49 *;
 [I]WO2012082421  (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]; ATI TECHNOLOGIES ULC [CA]; MCCRARY RE) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0041] *;
 [I]US2010242014  (ZHU XIAOHAN [US]) [I] 1,8,13 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2007018979  (BUDAGAVI MADHUKAR [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0033] *
 [X]  - PUJARA C ET AL, "VC-1 video decoder optimization on ARM Cortex-A8 with NEON", COMMUNICATIONS (NCC), 2010 NATIONAL CONFERENCE ON, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20100129), ISBN 978-1-4244-6383-1, pages 1 - 5, XP031648181 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - BURSKY D, "PARALLELISM PUSHES DSP THROUGHPUT. ÖA PARALLEL-PROCESSING DSP IC TAKES AIM AT MULTIMEDIA, DELIVERING 2GOPS WITH FOUR 32-BIT DSP ENGINES PLUS A RISC CPU", ELECTRONIC DESIGN, PENTON MEDIA, CLEVELAND, OH, US, (19940321), vol. 42, no. 6, ISSN 0013-4872, XP000449358 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *