Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2799989 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2799989



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 182
03.08.2017 Closing of application Search / examination 1
04.05.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 1
04.04.2017 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 2
23.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
23.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
16.11.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.06.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
24.06.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
24.06.2015 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
24.06.2015 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
24.02.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
08.01.2015 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
20.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
20.11.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
20.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 3
04.11.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
08.10.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
11.07.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
02.07.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.06.2014 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
26.05.2014 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
08.05.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
08.05.2014 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.04.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
04.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 46
18.03.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.03.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
18.03.2014 Description Search / examination 21
18.03.2014 Drawings Search / examination 10
18.03.2014 Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies Search / examination 1
21.02.2014 Deficiencies in application documents - annex B Search / examination 3
03.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
03.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 3
03.02.2014 Description Search / examination 21
03.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 10
03.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5