Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2799989


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
04.08.2017 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  06.09.2017  [2017/36]
03.05.2017 New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit
05.04.2017 New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit
02.12.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
25.11.2016 First examination report
29.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Amendment by applicant
03.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
03.07.2015 Change - request for examination published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
21.11.2014 Publication of search report published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
21.11.2014 Change - classification published on  24.12.2014  [2014/52]
04.11.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]
03.10.2014 Request for examination filed published on  05.11.2014  [2014/45]