Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2799989 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN201410145966 EP14153640



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
US2014310720Global Dossier 16.10.2014A1
Priority number Date
KR20130039740 11.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
KR20140122835Global Dossier 21.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130039740 11.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2014206979Global Dossier 30.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130039740 11.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CN104102472Global Dossier 15.10.2014A
Priority number Date
KR20130039740 11.04.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2799989Global Dossier 24.12.2014A3
EP2799989 05.11.2014A2
Priority number Date
KR20130039740 11.04.2013