Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2818982 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2818982



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 345
24.07.2019 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
01.10.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
23.08.2018 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.08.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.08.2018 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
07.08.2018 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
07.08.2018 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
07.08.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
03.04.2018 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
03.04.2018 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
03.04.2018 Text intended for grant Search / examination 45
03.04.2018 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 44
14.03.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
14.03.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
14.03.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
14.03.2017 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.11.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
14.11.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.03.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
12.02.2016 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
30.06.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.06.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
18.03.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
18.03.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 24
18.03.2015 Claims Search / examination 3
18.03.2015 Description Search / examination 22
18.03.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
18.03.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
20.02.2015 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Request for change of applicant's representative Search / examination 2
08.01.2015 Information about publication, reminder payment of designation fee, response to extended European search report, if applicable Search / examination 2
03.12.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
18.11.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
03.11.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
03.11.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
22.10.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
22.04.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
08.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 69
05.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
05.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
05.02.2014 Description Search / examination 24
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 19
05.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5