Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2818982


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
08.11.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.12.2019 [2019/50]
18.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.11.2019 [2019/47]
04.10.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.11.2019  [2019/45]
26.07.2019 No opposition filed within time limit published on  28.08.2019  [2019/35]
19.07.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.08.2019  [2019/34]
31.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.07.2019  [2019/27]
24.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.06.2019  [2019/26]
10.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.06.2019  [2019/24]
03.05.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.06.2019  [2019/23]
26.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.05.2019  [2019/22]
19.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.05.2019  [2019/21]
12.04.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.05.2019  [2019/20]
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
08.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.03.2019  [2019/11]
01.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  06.03.2019  [2019/10]
18.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.02.2019  [2019/08]
11.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.02.2019  [2019/07]
17.08.2018 (Expected) grant published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
10.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
10.08.2018 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
07.08.2018 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
02.04.2018 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.02.2018 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.02.2018 Change - German title published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018 Change - English title published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
23.02.2018 Change - French title published on  28.03.2018  [2018/13]
15.03.2017 New entry: Reply to examination report
28.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
23.11.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.07.2016 New entry: Reply to examination report
25.03.2016 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
29.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
10.07.2015 Change - designated states published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
20.03.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.02.2015 Change - representative
30.12.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
28.11.2014 Request for examination filed published on  31.12.2014  [2015/01]
28.11.2014 First examination report