Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2818982

EP2818982 - Display apparatus and image erasing device system for electronic chalkboard system and control method thereof. [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2015/01]Image erasing device for electronic chalkboard system, control method thereof, display apparatus, control method thereof and electronic chalkboard system
[2018/13]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Database last updated on 11.11.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.08.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  02.04.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip08.11.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
[2018/38]
Former [2015/01]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / Yoo, Ho-june
Donam Isu Brownstone Apt.
112-1301, Donam 2-dong
Seongbuk-gu
Seoul / KR
02 / Moon, Jong-bo
Byeokjeokgol 8 Danji Hanshin Apt. 812-2003
Yeongtong 2-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Soh, Byung-seok
Heungdeok Maeul 5 Danji Hoban Vertium Apt.
508-403
Yeongdeok-dong
Giheung-gu, Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Lee, Jong-keun
Sangnoksu Apt. 108-106
Irwonbon-dong
Gangnam-gu
Seoul / KR
05 / Choi, Sang-on
4 danji Kunyoung Apt. 423-105
Yeongtong-dong
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
06 / Choi, Hyun-mook
Poongrim I-won Magic 408
1321-9, Seocho-dong
Seocho-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2015/01]
Representative(s)Appleyard Lees IP LLP
15 Clare Road
Halifax HX1 2HY / GB
[2018/38]
Former [2015/01]Brandon, Paul Laurence
Appleyard Lees
15 Clare Road
Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB
Application number, filing date14154035.105.02.2014
[2015/01]
Priority number, dateKR2013007597028.06.2013         Original published format: KR 20130075970
[2015/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2818982
Date:31.12.2014
Language:EN
[2015/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2818982
Date:19.09.2018
Language:EN
[2018/38]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.11.2014
ClassificationInternational:G06F3/0354, G06F3/046
[2015/01]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2015/33]
Former [2015/01]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Anzeigevorrichtungs- und Bildlöschvorrichtungssystem für elektronisches Kreidetafelsystem und Steuerverfahren dafür.[2018/13]
English:Display apparatus and image erasing device system for electronic chalkboard system and control method thereof.[2018/13]
French:Système comprenant un appareil d'affichage et un dispositif d'effacement d'image pour tableau noir électronique et son procédé de commande.[2018/13]
Former [2015/01]Bildlöschvorrichtung für elektronisches Kreidetafelsystem, Steuerverfahren dafür, Anzeigevorrichtung, Steuerverfahren dafür sowie elektronisches Kreidetafelsystem
Former [2015/01]Image erasing device for electronic chalkboard system, control method thereof, display apparatus, control method thereof and electronic chalkboard system
Former [2015/01]Dispositif d'effacement d'image pour système de tableau noir électronique, son procédé de commande, appareil d'affichage, procédé de commande correspondant et système de tableau noir électronique
Examination procedure05.02.2014Examination requested  [2015/01]
18.11.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.03.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.03.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.04.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.2018Fee for grant paid
07.08.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.08.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.11.2014
Opposition(s)20.06.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.02.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2018Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SI19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
LU05.02.2019
[2019/50]
Former [2019/47]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
LU05.02.2019
Former [2019/45]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
MC19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/34]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
DK19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/26]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
SM19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
PT19.01.2019
Former [2019/23]AL19.09.2018
AT19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
EE19.09.2018
ES19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
SK19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/22]AL19.09.2018
CZ19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
PL19.09.2018
RO19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/21]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
IT19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
IS19.01.2019
Former [2019/20]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
NL19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/12]AL19.09.2018
FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
LV19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/11]FI19.09.2018
HR19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/10]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
RS19.09.2018
SE19.09.2018
BG19.12.2018
NO19.12.2018
GR20.12.2018
Former [2019/08]FI19.09.2018
LT19.09.2018
NO19.12.2018
Former [2019/07]LT19.09.2018
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0347725  (WACOM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8,13 * column 2, line 31 - column 3, line 49 * * column 9, line 19 - column 10, line 24; figure 5 * * column 14, line 48 - column 15, line 25; claim - * [A] 9-12,14;
 [XA]EP0114093  (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [X] 9-12,14 * page 1, line 15 - line 23 * * page 3, line 14 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 28 - page 7, line 5 * * page 10, line 36 - page 11, line 13; claim - * [A] 1-8,13;
 [I]WO9839729  (ELECTRONICS FOR IMAGING INC [US]; HOLTZMAN RAFI [US]; ZLOTER ISAAC [IL) [I] 1-14 * page 15, line 1 - line 8; figure 13 *;
 [A]US2009309839  (HILDEBRANDT PETER W [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0041] - [0046]; figures 2A,2B,5 *