blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2765001 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2765001



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 214
14.11.2018 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
26.01.2018 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.12.2017 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
13.11.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2017 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
13.11.2017 German translation of the claims Search / examination 4
13.11.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
20.07.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
20.07.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
20.07.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
20.07.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
06.07.2017 Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 2
20.06.2017 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.06.2017 Claims Search / examination 3
20.06.2017 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.06.2017 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
22.02.2017 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
22.02.2017 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
22.02.2017 Text intended for grant Search / examination 18
22.02.2017 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 18
24.01.2017 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
02.02.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
27.04.2015 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
13.02.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
13.02.2015 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
13.02.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
13.02.2015 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 8
13.02.2015 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 8
13.02.2015 Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
13.02.2015 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
13.02.2015 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
19.08.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
16.07.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
21.05.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
21.05.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 3
21.05.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
07.05.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
16.04.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
10.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 27
07.03.2014 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
10.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 2
10.02.2014 Description Search / examination 7
10.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 7
10.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4