blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2765001


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
22.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.03.2019  [2019/13]
15.02.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  20.03.2019  [2019/12]
25.01.2019 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.02.2019  [2019/09]
23.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.12.2018  [2018/52]
16.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
16.11.2018 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.12.2018  [2018/51]
09.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.12.2018  [2018/50]
02.11.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.12.2018  [2018/49]
19.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.11.2018  [2018/47]
12.10.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.11.2018  [2018/46]
14.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.10.2018  [2018/42]
07.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.10.2018  [2018/41]
31.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.10.2018  [2018/40]
24.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.09.2018  [2018/39]
10.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.09.2018  [2018/37]
03.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.09.2018  [2018/36]
27.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.08.2018  [2018/35]
20.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.08.2018  [2018/34]
08.12.2017 (Expected) grant published on  10.01.2018  [2018/02]
24.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
24.11.2017 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
13.11.2017 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
19.07.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.06.2017 Deletion: Communication of intention to grant a patent
21.02.2017 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
01.02.2017 New entry: Renewal fee paid
09.02.2016 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.02.2015 Change - designated states published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
20.02.2015 Change - request for examination published on  25.03.2015  [2015/13]
17.02.2015 Amendment by applicant
12.08.2014 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]
11.07.2014 Request for examination filed published on  13.08.2014  [2014/33]