blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2765001
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9216581Global Dossier 22.12.2015B2
US2014225958 14.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201414175619 07.02.2014
US201361762713 08.02.2013
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
EP2765001Global Dossier 10.01.2018B1
EP2765001 13.08.2014A1
Priority number Date
US201361762713 08.02.2013