Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2765001

EP2765001 - Apparatus and method for wiping an inkjet cartridge nozzle plate [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.11.2018
Database last updated on 22.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.12.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  19.07.2017
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  28.06.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip22.02.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BE, SI
published on 27.03.2019  [2019/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
R. R. Donnelley & Sons Company
111 South Wacker Drive Chicago
Illinois 60606 / US
[2014/33]
Inventor(s)01 / Cyman, Theodore F
1172 Majestic Woods Drive
Grand Island, NY New York 14072 / US
02 / Moscato, Anthony V
7192 Creekbend
North Tonawanda, NY New York 14120 / US
03 / Sabin, Jeffrey M
37 Larsen Lane
West Seneca, NY New York 14224 / US
 [2014/33]
Representative(s)Serjeants LLP
Dock
75 Exploration Drive
Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB
[2018/02]
Former [2014/33]Serjeants LLP
25 The Crescent
King Street
Leicester, LE1 6RX / GB
Application number, filing date14154513.710.02.2014
[2014/33]
Priority number, dateUS201361762713P08.02.2013         Original published format: US 201361762713 P
[2014/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2765001
Date:13.08.2014
Language:EN
[2014/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2765001
Date:10.01.2018
Language:EN
[2018/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.05.2014
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/165
[2014/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2018/02]
Former [2014/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Abwischen für eine Tintenstrahlpatronen-Düsenplatte[2014/33]
English:Apparatus and method for wiping an inkjet cartridge nozzle plate[2014/33]
French:Appareil et procédé d'essuyage d'une plaque de buse d'une cartouche d'encre[2014/33]
Examination procedure12.02.2015Examination requested  [2015/13]
13.02.2015Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
22.02.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.06.2017Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
20.07.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.11.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.11.2017Fee for grant paid
20.11.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.02.2017
Opposition(s)11.10.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.02.2016Renewal fee patent year 03
24.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SI10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE10.02.2018
LU10.02.2018
BE28.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
[2019/12]
Former [2019/09]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
IE10.02.2018
LU10.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/52]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
SM10.01.2018
LU10.02.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/51]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
DK10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
CH28.02.2018
LI28.02.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/50]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
CZ10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
SK10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/49]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
EE10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
MC10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RO10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/47]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
IT10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/46]AL10.01.2018
AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/40]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
BG10.04.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/39]AT10.01.2018
CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
LV10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
RS10.01.2018
SE10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
IS10.05.2018
Former [2018/37]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
GR11.04.2018
Former [2018/36]CY10.01.2018
ES10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
PL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/35]CY10.01.2018
FI10.01.2018
HR10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Former [2018/34]FI10.01.2018
LT10.01.2018
NL10.01.2018
NO10.04.2018
Documents cited:Search[X]US5570117  (KARAMBELAS RANDY C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9 * column 4, line 9 - line 41 *;
 [X]US2007165063  (HORIE KAORU [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,10-12 * paragraphs [0144] , [ 208] , [ 209] *;
 [XA]EP0676288  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 16, line 45 - column 17, line 2 * [A] 2-6,8-12;
 [XA]US2009040268  (MIYAZAWA HISASHI [JP]) [X] 1,7 * paragraph [0236] - paragraph [0239] * [A] 2-6,8-12