Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2784536

EP2784536 - Radar apparatus and computer-readable storage medium [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.03.2017
Database last updated on 12.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip23.08.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): BG
published on 25.09.2019  [2019/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP
[2014/40]
Inventor(s)01 / Sugiyama, Yuuichi
c/o FUJITSU TEN LIMITED
2-28, Gosho-dori 1-chome
Hyogo-ku
Kobe-shi
Hyogo, 652-8510 / JP
 [2014/40]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2016/19]
Former [2014/40]Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date14154822.212.02.2014
[2014/40]
Priority number, dateJP2013007503329.03.2013         Original published format: JP 2013075033
[2014/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2784536
Date:01.10.2014
Language:EN
[2014/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2784536
Date:11.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2014
ClassificationInternational:G01S13/02, G01S13/34, G01S13/58, G01S13/92
[2016/01]
Former International [2014/40]G01S13/58, G01S13/92
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2016/19]
Former [2014/40]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:Radarvorrichtung und computerlesbares Speichermedium[2014/40]
English:Radar apparatus and computer-readable storage medium[2014/40]
French:Appareil de radar et support de stockage lisible par ordinateur[2014/40]
Examination procedure10.10.2014Examination requested  [2014/47]
24.10.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.03.2016Fee for grant paid
21.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
21.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2015
Opposition(s)14.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU12.02.2014
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
BG11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE12.02.2017
LU12.02.2017
MT12.02.2017
[2019/39]
Former [2019/31]HU12.02.2014
AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE12.02.2017
LU12.02.2017
MT12.02.2017
Former [2018/46]AL11.05.2016
AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE12.02.2017
LU12.02.2017
MT12.02.2017
Former [2018/43]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE12.02.2017
LU12.02.2017
MT12.02.2017
Former [2018/13]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
IE12.02.2017
LU12.02.2017
Former [2018/04]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
LU12.02.2017
Former [2017/48]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
MC11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/37]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SI11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT11.05.2016
BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
SM11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE11.05.2016
CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
PL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
SK11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ11.05.2016
DK11.05.2016
EE11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RO11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK11.05.2016
ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
IT11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
SE11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
GR12.08.2016
PT12.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES11.05.2016
FI11.05.2016
HR11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
LV11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
RS11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/49]FI11.05.2016
LT11.05.2016
NL11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Former [2016/46]LT11.05.2016
NO11.08.2016
Documents cited:Search[AD]JP2010231604  (IHI CORP) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0038] * * claim 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]GB2425422  (AGD SYSTEMS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 9, line 10 - line 14 * * page 9, line 23 * * page 11, line 19 - line 21 * * claim 1 *
by applicantJP2010231604
 JPH09190593