Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2784536 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2784536



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 218
17.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
12.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
14.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
21.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
21.03.2016 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
14.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
14.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
14.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 43
14.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 43
15.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
24.10.2014 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
24.10.2014 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
24.10.2014 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
24.10.2014 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 3
24.10.2014 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
10.10.2014 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
10.10.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
07.10.2014 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.09.2014 Document concerning representation Search / examination 2
03.09.2014 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
14.05.2014 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2014 European search opinion Search / examination 4
29.04.2014 European search report Search / examination 2
14.04.2014 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 26
07.04.2014 Search started Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Abstract Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
12.02.2014 Claims Search / examination 4
12.02.2014 Description Search / examination 24
12.02.2014 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
12.02.2014 Drawings Search / examination 14
12.02.2014 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4